Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. v. Powers
Plaintiff: Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.
Defendant: Matthew Powers
Case Number: 1:2020cv05936
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time #6 is granted to 12/9/20. Telephonic status hearing set for 12/15/20 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 12/11/20. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Richard George Douglass for presentment of extension of time #6 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/17/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Douglass, Richard)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant Matthew Powers for extension of time (UNOPPOSED) (Douglass, Richard)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Matthew Powers by Richard George Douglass (Douglass, Richard)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. as to Matthew Powers on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Conley, Lindsey)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. by Richard B. Polony (Polony, Richard)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. by Lindsey A.L. Conley (Conley, Lindsey)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17512516. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conley, Lindsey)
October 6, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Matthew Powers (cm, )
October 6, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. v. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Powers
Represented By: Richard George Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsey A.L. Conley
Represented By: Richard B. Polony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?