Citizens Insurance Company of America et al v. Thermoflex Waukegan, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Citizens Insurance Company of America a member of The Hanover Insurance Group, Hanover Insurance Company and Citizens Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Thermoflex Waukegan, LLC and Gregory Gage
Case Number: 1:2020cv05980
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Amended ANSWER to amended complaint Second Amended Complaint, Amended COUNTERCLAIM filed by Thermoflex Waukegan, LLC against Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover Insurance Company . by Thermoflex Waukegan, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Goodman, David)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Second AMENDED complaint by Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover Insurance Company against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ognibene, Kelly)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for leave to file second amended complaint for declaratory judgment #15 is granted. Plaintiffs shall separately file its second amended complaint on or before 11/18/2020. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Gregory Gage by Ryan F Stephan (Stephan, Ryan)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiffs Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover Insurance Company, Counter Defendants Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover Insurance Company for leave to file Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ognibene, Kelly)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Gregory Gage by Anna Ceragioli (Ceragioli, Anna)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover Insurance Company. Gregory Gage waiver sent on 11/4/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Ognibene, Kelly)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Thermoflex Waukegan, LLC (Goodman, David)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to amended complaint , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Thermoflex Waukegan, LLC against Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover Insurance Company . by Thermoflex Waukegan, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Goodman, David)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED complaint by Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover Insurance Company against Gregory Gage, Thermoflex Waukegan, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ognibene, Kelly)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Thermoflex Waukegan, LLC by Carrie Ellen Davenport (Davenport, Carrie)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Thermoflex Waukegan, LLC by Kalli Kling Nies (Nies, Kalli)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Thermoflex Waukegan, LLC by David Benjamin Goodman (Goodman, David)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Citizens Insurance Company of America, Hanover Insurance Company as to Thermoflex Waukegan, LLC on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Ognibene, Kelly)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Thermoflex Waukegan, LLC (ke, )
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Citizens Insurance Company of America a member of The Hanover Insurance Group by Jeffrey Alan Goldwater (Goldwater, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citizens Insurance Company of America a member of The Hanover Insurance Group (Ognibene, Kelly)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Citizens Insurance Company of America a member of The Hanover Insurance Group by Kelly M. Ognibene (Ognibene, Kelly)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ognibene, Kelly)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by Citizens Insurance Company of America a member of The Hanover Insurance Group; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17519648. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ognibene, Kelly)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ke, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens Insurance Company of America et al v. Thermoflex Waukegan, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens Insurance Company of America a member of The Hanover Insurance Group
Represented By: Kelly M. Ognibene
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Goldwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelly M. Ognibene
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Goldwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Kelly M. Ognibene
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Goldwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermoflex Waukegan, LLC
Represented By: Kalli Kling Nies
Represented By: Carrie Ellen Davenport
Represented By: David Benjamin Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Gage
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: Anna Ceragioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?