Galvez v. Spring Creek Nursing & Rehab Center LLC
Plaintiff: OSCAR ENRIQUE GALVEZ and Oscar Enriquez Galvez
Defendant: Spring Creek Nursing & Rehab Center LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv06013
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Unopposed motion to extend time #8 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 11/9/2020. (mk)
October 12, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Oscar Enriquez Galvez by Mara Ann Baltabols (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Baltabols, Mara)
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Spring Creek Nursing & Rehab Center LLC for extension of time to file answer Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Oscar Enriquez Galvez by David J. Fish (Fish, David)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (lma, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Spring Creek Nursing & Rehab Center LLC by Joel Griswold (Griswold, Joel)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Spring Creek Nursing & Rehab Center LLC (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
October 8, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Spring Creek Nursing & Rehab Center LLC by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Twelfth Judicial Circuit Will County Illinois, case number (20 L 680) filed by Spring Creek Nursing & Rehab Center LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17524858. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galvez v. Spring Creek Nursing & Rehab Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Creek Nursing & Rehab Center LLC
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSCAR ENRIQUE GALVEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Enriquez Galvez
Represented By: David J. Fish
Represented By: Mara Ann Baltabols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?