Cusick v. Gualandri et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Cusick
Defendant: Dave Gualandri, Brian Zielmann, The County of LaSalle, Rod Englert D/B/A Englert Forensics Consultants, LLC, Julius Ballanco, The City of Ottawa, Scott Denton, Karen Donnelly, Unidentified Employees of The City of Ottawa and The County of LaSalle, Scott Cruz and Jody Bernard
Case Number: 1:2020cv06017
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jody Bernard, The County of LaSalle by Dominick L Lanzito (Lanzito, Dominick)
December 4, 2020 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jody Bernard, The County of LaSalle by Kevin Mark Casey (Casey, Kevin)
November 30, 2020 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant Scott Denton's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #31 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by 12/28/20. Mailed notice. (dm, )
November 25, 2020 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Scott Denton by Anthony M Sam (Sam, Anthony)
November 25, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION by Defendant Scott Denton for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Larsen, Robert)
November 25, 2020 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Scott Denton by Robert L. Larsen (Larsen, Robert)
November 24, 2020 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Scott Cruz, Dave Gualandri, The City of Ottawa, Brian Zielmann by Scott Bryan Dolezal (Dolezal, Scott)
November 24, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by The City of Ottawa. The City of Ottawa waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Harrington, Alison)
November 24, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Scott Cruz. Scott Cruz waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Harrington, Alison)
November 24, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dave Gualandri. Dave Gualandri waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Harrington, Alison)
November 24, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Brian Zielmann. Brian Zielmann waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Harrington, Alison)
November 24, 2020 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Scott Cruz, Dave Gualandri, The City of Ottawa, Brian Zielmann by Alison M Harrington (Harrington, Alison)
November 23, 2020 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Karen Donnelly by David T. Tichy (Tichy, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kenneth Cusick. Karen Donnelly waiver sent on 11/20/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Thompson, Tara)
November 23, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant Julius Ballanco's motion for extension of time #19 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by 12/28/20. Mailed notice. (dm, )
November 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Julius Ballanco re MOTION by Defendant Julius Ballanco for extension of time to file answer #19 (Ruff, Edward)
November 20, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant Julius Ballanco for extension of time to file answer (Ruff, Edward)
November 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Julius Ballanco re attorney appearance #16 (Ruff, Edward)
November 20, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Karen Donnelly by Kelly C. Bauer (Bauer, Kelly)
November 20, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Julius Ballanco by Edward B. Ruff, III (Ruff, Edward)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant Rod Englert's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #11 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by 12/28/20. The deadline of 12/22/20 for parties to file a joint initial status report is re-set to 1/18/21. Mailed notice. (dm, )
November 13, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kenneth Cusick by Makeba Alinda Kokugonz Rutahindurwa (Rutahindurwa, Makeba)
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kenneth Cusick. The County of LaSalle waiver sent on 10/22/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Thompson, Tara)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kenneth Cusick. Jody Bernard waiver sent on 10/22/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Thompson, Tara)
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Rod Englert for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Luchsinger, Michael)
November 11, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Cusick as to Scott Denton on 11/6/2020, answer due 11/27/2020. (Thompson, Tara)
November 11, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rod Englert by Michael Thomas Sprengnether (Sprengnether, Michael)
November 10, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rod Englert by Faredin Ameti (Ameti, Faredin)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rod Englert by Michael Robert Luchsinger (Luchsinger, Michael)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Cusick as to Julius Ballanco on 10/31/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Thompson, Tara)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Cusick as to Rod Englert on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. (Thompson, Tara)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 12/22/20, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 22, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Julius Ballanco, Jody Bernard, Scott Cruz, Scott Denton, Karen Donnelly, Rod Englert, Dave Gualandri, The City of Ottawa, The County of LaSalle, Brian Zielmann (cm, )
October 9, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) Modified on 10/9/2020 (pj, ).
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kenneth Cusick by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kenneth Cusick by Tara Elizabeth Thompson (Thompson, Tara)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt # 0752-17525301 filed by Kenneth Cusick; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Loevy, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cusick v. Gualandri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Gualandri
Represented By: Scott Bryan Dolezal
Represented By: Alison M Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Zielmann
Represented By: Scott Bryan Dolezal
Represented By: Alison M Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of LaSalle
Represented By: Kevin Mark Casey
Represented By: Dominick L Lanzito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Englert D/B/A Englert Forensics Consultants, LLC
Represented By: Faredin Ameti
Represented By: Michael Robert Luchsinger
Represented By: Michael Thomas Sprengnether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julius Ballanco
Represented By: Edward B. Ruff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Ottawa
Represented By: Scott Bryan Dolezal
Represented By: Alison M Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Denton
Represented By: Robert L. Larsen
Represented By: Anthony M Sam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Donnelly
Represented By: David T. Tichy
Represented By: Kelly C. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Employees of The City of Ottawa and The County of LaSalle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Cruz
Represented By: Scott Bryan Dolezal
Represented By: Alison M Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Bernard
Represented By: Kevin Mark Casey
Represented By: Dominick L Lanzito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Cusick
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Represented By: Makeba Alinda Kokugonz Rutahindurwa
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?