T & J's 5th Down, Inc. v. Society Insurance, a Mutual Company
Plaintiff: T & J's 5th Down, Inc. On behalf of Itself and All Others Similarly Situated doing business as Kaysan's 5th Down Bar & Grill
Defendant: Society Insurance
Case Number: 1:2020cv06153
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 17 MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all counsel of record. (bg, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 16 RECEIVED from Indiana Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00308 (bg)
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to Multi-District Litigation MDL-2964, In Re: Society Insurance Company Covid-19 Business Interruption Protection Insurance Litigation, in the Northern District of Illinois, before Judge Edmond E Chang. Signed by John Nichols Clerk of the Panel on 10/15/20. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from Clerk, Northern District of Illinois re: transfer of this case to MDL-2964 (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 (uncertified) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Northern District of Illinois before Judge Edmond E Chang. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 10/15/2020. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #11 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time is granted. Dft granted to and including 10/20/2020 to file a response to the Amended Complaint. Text entry order.(mr) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Society Insurance. (Ruesch, Meghan) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Society Insurance. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - William I. Brunzel Declaration)(Ruesch, Meghan) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due 10/6/2020 per #9 Agreed Notice (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Society Insurance ; answer due by October 6, 2020. (Ruesch, Meghan) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Defendant is afforded up to and including September 17, 2020, to filean amended notice of removal in an attempt to establish diversity jurisdiction. Failure to do so may result in remand of this case to Allen Superior Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 9/3/20. (mlc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. *NEW CASE* (lhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle P Kilies on behalf of Society Insurance, a Mutual Company (Kilies, Janelle) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Dina M Cox on behalf of Society Insurance, a Mutual Company (Cox, Dina) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Trimble on behalf of Society Insurance, a Mutual Company (Trimble, John) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan E Ruesch on behalf of Society Insurance, a Mutual Company (Ruesch, Meghan) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4327628.) from Allen County, Cause No. 02D02-2005-CT-000246, filed by Society Insurance, a Mutual Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit Amended Class Action Complaint)(Ruesch, Meghan) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED STATE COURT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Society Insurance, filed Allen Superior Court, 02D02-2005-CT-000246, by T & J's 5th Down, Inc. (lhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 STATE COURT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Society Insurance, filed in Allen Superior Court, 02D02-2005-CT-000246, by T & J's 5th Down, Inc.(lhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T & J's 5th Down, Inc. v. Society Insurance, a Mutual Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society Insurance
Represented By: Dina M Cox
Represented By: John C Trimble
Represented By: Meghan E Ruesch
Represented By: Janelle P Kilies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T & J's 5th Down, Inc. On behalf of Itself and All Others Similarly Situated doing business as Kaysan's 5th Down Bar & Grill
Represented By: Phillip A Truitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?