RSV Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Society Insurance
Plaintiff: MJPD Ventures, LLC On behalf of themselves and others similarly situated doing business as Winestyles of Ankeny and RSV Enterprises, Inc. On behalf of theselves and others similarly situated doing business as Drake Diner
Defendant: Society Insurance
Case Number: 1:2020cv06154
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 20 MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all counsel of record. (bg, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 19 RECEIVED from Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00256 (bg)
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1)by clerk's Office, Northern District of Illinois MDL No. 2964 (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 Certified Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2964 for the Northern District of Illinois. (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) Finalized on 10/15/20. Please see pleading (4 in IAS/4:20-cv-00256, 4 in IAS/4:20-cv-00274, 4 in ILC/1:20-cv-01327, 4 in ILC/1:20-cv-01328, 4 in ILS/3:20-cv-00765, 4 in INN/1:20-cv-00308, 93 in MDL No. 2964, 4 in TNM/3:20-cv-00604, 7 in WIE/2:20-cv-01340). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. Illinois for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 10/15/2020.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2964, IAS/4:20-cv-00256, IAS/4:20-cv-00274, ILC/1:20-cv-01327, ILC/1:20-cv-01328, ILS/3:20-cv-00765, INN/1:20-cv-00308, TNM/3:20-cv-00604, WIE/2:20-cv-01340 (SM) (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Set Deadline: Status Report due by 4/1/2021. (mem) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay and denying without prejudice #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The parties shall provide status reports beginning on 4/1/2021, and every 30 days thereafter, on whether the stay should be continued. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 10/7/2020. (mem) (Main Document 15 replaced on 10/8/2020) (mem). [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by MJPD Ventures, LLC, RSV Enterprises, Inc. re #13 Notice (Other), #7 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a deicion from the Judicial Panl on Multidistrict Litigation or In the Alternative Motion for Continuance of Deadline to File Reponse to Motion to Dismiss Amended (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CTO Covid Cases)(Galligan, Brian) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by MJPD Ventures, LLC, RSV Enterprises, Inc. re #7 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a deicion from the Judicial Panl on Multidistrict Litigation or In the Alternative Motion for Continuance of Deadline to File Reponse to Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CTO)(Galligan, Brian) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 ***SUPPLEMENTAL*** NOTICE by MJPD Ventures, LLC, RSV Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decision Creating Society-Specific MDL)(Galligan, Brian) Modified on 10/6/2020, linked to motion #7 (kjw). [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY Memorandum in Support of re #7 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a deicion from the Judicial Panl on Multidistrict Litigation or In the Alternative Motion for Continuance of Deadline to File Reponse to Motion to Dismiss filed by MJPD Ventures, LLC, RSV Enterprises, Inc..(Galligan, Brian) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a deicion from the Judicial Panl on Multidistrict Litigation or In the Alternative Motion for Continuance of Deadline to File Reponse to Motion to Dismiss filed by Society Insurance. Replies due by 10/5/2020.(Cook, Guy) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Although Plaintiffs provide no good cause for the requested second extension, because the Motion is unresisted the Court partially grants the Motion. Plaintiffs have until 10/07/2020 to file their Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. No further extension will be granted. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/18/2020. (bam) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs response to Motion to Dismiss by MJPD Ventures, LLC, RSV Enterprises, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 10/2/2020. (Galligan, Brian) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a deicion from the Judicial Panl on Multidistrict Litigation or In the Alternative Motion for Continuance of Deadline to File Reponse to Motion to Dismiss by MJPD Ventures, LLC, RSV Enterprises, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay)(Galligan, Brian) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Society Insurance. (Cook, Guy) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time of File. The Court finds good cause for the following extension: Plaintiffs have until 09/23/2020 to file their Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/1/2020. (bam) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File FOR PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS by MJPD Ventures, LLC, RSV Enterprises, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 9/15/2020. (Galligan, Brian) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Society Insurance. Responses due by 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix)(Cook, Guy) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the corporate disclosure packet. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 9/2/2020. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 9/2/2020. (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Chief Judge John A. Jarvey added. Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. (slg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Society Insurance from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number CVCV060150. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4215479., filed by Society Insurance. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix to Notice of Removal, #2 Attchment 1 - Class Action Petition, #3 Attachment 2 - Original Notice, #4 Attachment 3 - Amended Class Action Petition, #5 Attachment 4 - Amended Class Action Petition attachment, #6 Attachment 5 - Application for PHV for M. Reilly, #7 Attachment 6 - Certificate of Good Standing, #8 Attachment 7 - Return of Service on Original Notice)(Cook, Guy) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RSV Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Society Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MJPD Ventures, LLC On behalf of themselves and others similarly situated doing business as Winestyles of Ankeny
Represented By: Richard W. Schulte
Represented By: Brian P Galligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RSV Enterprises, Inc. On behalf of theselves and others similarly situated doing business as Drake Diner
Represented By: Richard W. Schulte
Represented By: Brian P Galligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society Insurance
Represented By: Laura Nicole Martino
Represented By: Guy R. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?