Elevated Industry, LLC v. Society Insurance
Plaintiff: Elevated Industry, LLC doing business as 300 Craft & Rooftop
Defendant: Society Insurance
Case Number: 1:2020cv06155
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 19 MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all counsel of record. (bg, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 18 RECEIVED from Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00274 (bg)
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1)by clerk's Office, Northern District of Illinois MDL No. 2964. (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 Certified Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2964 for the Northern District of Illinois. (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) Finalized on 10/15/20. Please see pleading (4 in IAS/4:20-cv-00256, 4 in IAS/4:20-cv-00274, 4 in ILC/1:20-cv-01327, 4 in ILC/1:20-cv-01328, 4 in ILS/3:20-cv-00765, 4 in INN/1:20-cv-00308, 93 in MDL No. 2964, 4 in TNM/3:20-cv-00604, 7 in WIE/2:20-cv-01340). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. Illinois for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 10/15/2020.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2964, IAS/4:20-cv-00256, IAS/4:20-cv-00274, ILC/1:20-cv-01327, ILC/1:20-cv-01328, ILS/3:20-cv-00765, INN/1:20-cv-00308, TNM/3:20-cv-00604, WIE/2:20-cv-01340 (SM) (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION to Stay by Elevated Industry, LLC.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 10/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Judge Jarvey Order to Stay)(Mauro, Nicholas) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Defendant's Rule 12(b) Motion. The Court finds good cause for the following extension: Plaintiffs have until 10/13/2020 to file a Resistance to Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/30/2020. (bam) Modified on 9/30/2020 (bam). [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Defendant's Rule 12(b) Motion by Elevated Industry, LLC.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 10/14/2020. (Mauro, Nicholas) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Plaintiff's First Amended and Substituted Complaint) by Society Insurance. Responses due by 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Appendix)(Cook, Guy) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Elevated Industry, LLC. (Mauro, Nicholas) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Society Insurance. (Cook, Guy) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Plaintiff's First Amended and Substituted Complaint) by Society Insurance. Responses due by 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Appendix)(Cook, Guy) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER Finding as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. In light of #6 First Amended Complaint, Defendant's motion to dismiss is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 9/8/2020. (hfh) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT pursuant to Rule 15(a)(1)(B) against Society Insurance., filed by Elevated Industry, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Policy, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Declination Letter)(Mauro, Nicholas) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 Errata re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Society Insurance. (Cook, Guy) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 ***ERRATA***MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Society Insurance. Responses due by 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix Pages 98-204)(Cook, Guy) Modified on 9/8/2020 Part two of the Appendix, linked to Motion #3 . (don). [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Society Insurance. Responses due by 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Appendix Appendix through pg. 97)(Cook, Guy) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 9/21/2020. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 9/21/2020. (slg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Society Insurance from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL148335. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4232677., filed by Society Insurance. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Attachment 1 - Petition, #3 Attachment 2 - Exhibit A, #4 Attachment 3 - Exhibit B, #5 Attachment 4 - Original Notice, #6 Attachment 5 - Original Notice, #7 Attachment 6 - Acceptance of Service)(Cook, Guy) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elevated Industry, LLC v. Society Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society Insurance
Represented By: Laura Nicole Martino
Represented By: Guy R. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elevated Industry, LLC doing business as 300 Craft & Rooftop
Represented By: Nicholas J. Mauro
Represented By: James W. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?