Farm2Table, LLC v. Society Insurance
Plaintiff: Farm2Table, LLC doing business as Sea Salt
Defendant: Society Insurance
Case Number: 1:2020cv06156
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 22 MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all counsel of record. (bg, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 21 RECEIVED from Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-00604 (bg)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Pursuant to the Conditional Transfer Order of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Docket No. 2964, this case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois for coordinated or consolidated proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and electronically transmit the record to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/16/2020. (dt)[Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER MDL 2964 (CTO-1) received from the Northern District of Illinois. (Case is ready for closing/transfer; proposed order submitted to chambers.) (bs) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 FINAL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) filed by the UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL on MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, IN RE: SOCIETY INSURANCE COMPANY COVID19 BUSINESS INTERRUPTION PROTECTION INSURANCE LITIGATION, MDL No. 2964, transferring the case to the Northern District of Illinois. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. (bs) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Given the pendency of a Motion to Dismiss #6 , it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for 9/14/2020 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following disposition of this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/9/2020. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint filed by Society Insurance. (Campbell, Curtis) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Defendant's Motion for Enlargement to file additional pages for reply. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/12/2020. (vh) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Society Insurance. (Campbell, Curtis) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; 29-page brief allowed. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/12/2020. (jw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Farm2Table, LLC. (Clements, Kirk) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint filed by Farm2Table, LLC. (Clements, Kirk) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint. Extension to 8/10/2020. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/5/2020. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint Unopposed by Farm2Table, LLC. (Clements, Kirk) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
July 22, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kirk Lee Clements, E. Jason Ferrell, Curtis L. Campbell, Parks T. Chastain. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 3:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint filed by Society Insurance . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executive Order No. 17, #2 Exhibit B - Executive Order No. 21, #3 Exhibit C - Executive Order No. 22, #4 Exhibit D - Amended and Restated Order 1 Chief Med Director, #5 Exhibit E - Order 3 from Chief Med Director, #6 Exhibit F - Executive Order No. 27)(Campbell, Curtis) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint by Society Insurance. (Campbell, Curtis) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
July 20, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Curtis L. Campbell. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis L. Campbell on behalf of Society Insurance (Campbell, Curtis) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Society Insurance. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Society Insurance from Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 20C1320. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0650-3177285) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Exhibit A to State Court Complaint, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 10/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm2Table, LLC v. Society Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society Insurance
Represented By: E. Jason Ferrell
Represented By: Curtis L. Campbell
Represented By: Parks T. Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm2Table, LLC doing business as Sea Salt
Represented By: Kirk Lee Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?