Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC v. Society Insurance
Plaintiff: Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC
Defendant: Society Insurance
Case Number: 1:2020cv06159
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 22 MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all counsel of record. (bg, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 21 RECEIVED from Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01340 (bg)
October 15, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFIED Conditional Transfer Order to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter from ILND) (cc: all counsel)(vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurence S Berman, I on behalf of Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Laurence S. Berman (Berman, Laurence) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 18 APPENDIX by defendant Society Insurance Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 to Defendant's Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Appendix 2 to Defendant's Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Appendix 3 to Defendant's Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Appendix 4 to Defendant's Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #5 Appendix 5 to Defendant's Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #6 Appendix 6 to Defendant's Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #7 Appendix 7 to Defendant's Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #8 Appendix 8 to Defendant's Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #9 Appendix 9 to Defendant's Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #10 Appendix 10 to Defendant's Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #11 Appendix 11 to Defendant's Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #12 Appendix 12 to Defendant's Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #13 Appendix 13 to Defendant's Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #14 Appendix 14 to Defendant's Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #15 Appendix 15 to Defendant's Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #16 Appendix 16 to Defendant's Appendix of Unpublished Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Cain, Janet) Modified on 10/7/2020 (vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 BRIEF in Support filed by defendant Society Insurance Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC re #15 MOTION to Dismiss . (Cain, Janet) Modified on 10/7/2020 (vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE Statement by defendant Society Insurance Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC. (Cain, Janet) Modified on 10/7/2020 (vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by defendant Society Insurance Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC. (Cain, Janet) Modified on 10/7/2020 (vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet E Cain on behalf of Society Insurance Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher E. Avallone (Cain, Janet) Modified on 10/7/2020 (vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet E Cain on behalf of Society Insurance Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Beth J. Kushner (Cain, Janet) Modified on 10/7/2020 (vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet E Cain on behalf of Society Insurance Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Heidi L. Vogt (Cain, Janet) Modified on 10/7/2020 (vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet E Cain on behalf of Society Insurance Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Janet E. Cain (Cain, Janet) Modified on 10/7/2020 (vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
September 23, 2020 This case has been reassigned to newly appointed Judge Brett Ludwig. (kmm) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Burns, Timothy) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Exhibit A, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement on September 16, 2020 by Bill Bunzel of Society Insurance (Burns, Timothy) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Wilson D Miles, III on behalf of Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Wilson Daniel "Dee" Miles, III (Miles, Wilson) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel N Boyd on behalf of Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Rachel N. Boyd (Boyd, Rachel) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul W Evans on behalf of Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Paul W. Evans (Evans, Paul) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Summons Issued as to Society Insurance. (asc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Freya K Bowen on behalf of Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Freya K. Bowen (Bowen, Freya) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff J Bowen on behalf of Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeff J. Bowen (Bowen, Jeff) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse J Bair on behalf of Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Jesse J. Bair (Bair, Jesse) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
August 31, 2020 FILING FEE Received: $400.00, receipt number 4689083710. (cmb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
August 31, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC. (Burns, Timothy) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Society Insurance by Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Society Insurance Policy, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burns, Timothy) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 10/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC v. Society Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wiseguys Pizzeria & Pub LLC
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Laurence S. Berman
Represented By: Jeff James Bowen
Represented By: Freya K. Bowen
Represented By: Timothy W Burns
Represented By: Paul W Evans
Represented By: Jesse J. Bair
Represented By: Rachel N Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society Insurance
Represented By: Beth J. Kushner
Represented By: Heidi L Vogt
Represented By: Janet E Cain
Represented By: Christopher E Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?