Perez v. City Of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Stacy Perez
Defendant: Officer Perez #16182, CITY OF CHICAGO, Unknown Officers and Officer Hanlon #3043
Case Number: 1:2020cv06186
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Officer Hanlon #3043, Officer Perez #16182 for extension of time to file answer regarding order on motion for extension of time, order on motion for extension of time to answer, terminate hearings, text entry #13 (Winistorfer, Mark)
December 1, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendant's unopposed motion for extension to answer or otherwise plead #12 is granted. The answer or other responsive pleading is due on or before 12/14/2020. Mailed notice (air, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Officer Hanlon #3043, Officer Perez #16182 for extension of time UNOPPOSED, MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Officer Hanlon #3043, Officer Perez #16182 for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 , order on motion for extension of time to answer, terminate hearings #7 (Winistorfer, Mark)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Officer Hanlon #3043, Officer Perez #16182 by Jennifer Kristine Bagby (Bagby, Jennifer)
November 25, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Officer Hanlon #3043, Officer Perez #16182 by Mark David Winistorfer (Winistorfer, Mark)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Bret Anthony Kabacinski of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (List of Cases Con'd))(Kabacinski, Bret)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stacy Perez by Angela Lockett Appearance (Lockett, Angela)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendants' unopposed motion for an extension #6 is granted. The answer or other responsive pleading is due on or before 11/30/2020. Mailed notice (air, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Officer Hanlon #3043, Officer Perez #16182 for extension of time to file answer UNOPPOSED (Campbell, Andrea)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Andrea Lindsey Campbell (Campbell, Andrea)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Bret Anthony Kabacinski (Kabacinski, Bret)
October 19, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
October 19, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants CITY OF CHICAGO, Officer Hanlon #3043, Officer Perez #16182 (cm, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stacy Perez by Jeanette Samuels (Samuels, Jeanette)
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Samuels, Jeanette)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Stacy Perez; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17552549.(Samuels, Jeanette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. City Of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Perez #16182
Represented By: Andrea Lindsey Campbell
Represented By: Jennifer Kristine Bagby
Represented By: Mark David Winistorfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Andrea Lindsey Campbell
Represented By: Bret Anthony Kabacinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hanlon #3043
Represented By: Andrea Lindsey Campbell
Represented By: Jennifer Kristine Bagby
Represented By: Mark David Winistorfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Perez
Represented By: Jeanette Samuels
Represented By: Angela Lockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?