Banner Life Insurance Company v. Kaur et al
Plaintiff: Banner Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Purab Kaur, Mayher Matharu, Vamsi Venisetty and Unknown Trustee of the Amarpal S. Matharu Trust Dated July 9, 2020
Case Number: 1:2020cv06467
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED bond Registry Deposit Information Form (Novotny, David)
December 11, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 12/11/2020. Mailed notice(vcf, )
December 7, 2020 BOND in the amount of $750,454.77 check, Receipt No. 4624249572, posted by Banner Life Insurance Company (txl, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Purab Kaur by Richard D. Boonstra (Boonstra, Richard)
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Banner Life Insurance Company. Purab Kaur waiver sent on 11/3/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Novotny, David)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/13/2020. Motion for leave to deposit #8 granted. Mailed notice(vcf, )
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Banner Life Insurance Company. Unknown Trustee of the Amarpal S. Matharu Trust Dated July 9, 2020 waiver sent on 11/3/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Janes, Sara)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex. A, #2 Registry Deposit Information Form)(Novotny, David)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/4/2020. Plaintiff's motion to seal complaint #6 is granted. Mailed notice(vcf, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Banner Life Insurance Company to seal document complaint, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Novotny, David)
October 30, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Banner Life Insurance Company by Sara Grace Janes (Janes, Sara)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Banner Life Insurance Company by David Joseph Novotny (Novotny, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Banner Life Insurance Company (Novotny, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Novotny, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader filed by Banner Life Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17597051. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Novotny, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banner Life Insurance Company v. Kaur et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purab Kaur
Represented By: Richard D. Boonstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayher Matharu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vamsi Venisetty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Trustee of the Amarpal S. Matharu Trust Dated July 9, 2020
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banner Life Insurance Company
Represented By: David Joseph Novotny
Represented By: Sara Grace Janes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?