Uniface B.V. v. Sysmex America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Uniface B.V.
Defendant: Sysmex America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06478
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendant Sysmex America, Inc. filed a motion to dismiss. Plaintiff Uniface's response is due on 1/8/21. Defendant's reply is due by 1/22/21. Discovery will be stayed pending the Court's resolution of the motion. The status hearings set for 12/3/20 and 12/16/20 are stricken and reset to 3/11/21 at 8:45 a.m. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. Mailed notice (ca, )
December 1, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Galassini, Valerie)
December 1, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion for leave to file an oversized brief #16 is granted. Plaintiff's response limited to 20 pages is due by 1/5/21; reply limited to 17 pages is due by 1/19/21.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sysmex America, Inc. by Mark L. Durbin (Durbin, Mark)
November 30, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sysmex America, Inc. by John T. Gabrielides (Gabrielides, John)
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sysmex America, Inc. by Genevieve Elizabeth Charlton (Charlton, Genevieve)
November 27, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Sysmex America, Inc. for leave to file oversized brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Stay)(Galassini, Valerie)
November 27, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Sysmex America, Inc. to dismiss (Galassini, Valerie)
November 27, 2020 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Sysmex America, Inc. (Galassini, Valerie)
November 27, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sysmex America, Inc. by Valerie Morgan Galassini John Gabrielides (Galassini, Valerie)
November 27, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sysmex America, Inc. by Valerie Morgan Galassini Genevieve Charlton (Galassini, Valerie)
November 27, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sysmex America, Inc. by Valerie Morgan Galassini Mark Durbin (Galassini, Valerie)
November 27, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sysmex America, Inc. by Valerie Morgan Galassini (Galassini, Valerie)
November 3, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Sysmex America, Inc. (kl, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion Hearing set for 12/3/20 at 9:00 a.m. A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 12/16/20 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 12/10/20. The report should comply with the requirements for initial joint status reports set forth in the Initial Status Conference standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==Mailed notice (ca, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (ec, )
November 2, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Uniface B.V. for discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Feb 11, 2020 letter from Sysmex)(Rosenfeld, Stephen)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Uniface B.V. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VAR Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Yugnuk Declaration)(Rosenfeld, Stephen)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Uniface B.V. for preliminary injunction (Rosenfeld, Stephen)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Uniface B.V. by Nicholas Anthony Kurk (Kurk, Nicholas)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Uniface B.V. by Stephen J. Rosenfeld (Rosenfeld, Stephen)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rosenfeld, Stephen)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Uniface B.V.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17598392.(Rosenfeld, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniface B.V. v. Sysmex America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysmex America, Inc.
Represented By: John T. Gabrielides
Represented By: Mark L. Durbin
Represented By: Valerie Morgan Galassini
Represented By: Genevieve E. Charlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniface B.V.
Represented By: Nicholas Anthony Kurk
Represented By: Stephen J. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?