Jerinic v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL JERINIC
Defendant: Amazon.com, LLC and Amazon.Com, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06485
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion to dismiss #19 is due 1/5/21. Defendants' reply is due 1/26/21. Mailed notice. (dm, )
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Motion to appear pro hac vice by Raechel Keay Kummer #15 is granted. Counsel is reminded to become familiar with this court's local rules (including the rules requiring local counsel and describing this court's trial bar). Mailed notice. (dm, )
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon.com, LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #19 (Herrington, Elizabeth)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon.com, LLC (Herrington, Elizabeth)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Amazon.com, LLC (Herrington, Elizabeth)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Amazon.com, Inc. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon.com, LLC by Clara Kollm (Kollm, Clara)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17716065. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Kummer, Raechel)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Because the deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's complaint falls on a weekend, Defendants shall respond on or before Monday, December 7, 2020. Mailed notice. (dm, )
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendants having established (Dkt. 12), at least for removal purposes, that there is minimal diversity, Defendants have complied with this Court's order (Dkt. 11) requiring a jurisdictional supplement as to subject matter jurisdiction. Joint initial status report remains due 1/8/21. Mailed notice. (dm, )
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Jurisdictional Supplement to Removal Notice by Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon.com, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herrington, Elizabeth)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendants have removed this case to federal court under the Class Action Fairness Act (CAFA). (Dkt. 1). CAFA requires minimal diversity. 28 USC 1332(d)(2)(A); see also Dancel v. Groupon, Inc., 940 F.3d 381 (7th Cir. 2019). Defendants state that Plaintiff is a "resident of the State of Illinois." However, for individuals, citizenship, not residence, matters: "[c]itizenship means domicile (the person's long-term plan for a state of habitation) rather than just current residence." Myrick v. WellPoint, Inc., 764 F.3d 662, 664 (7th Cir. 2014). As to the Defendants, they are reminded that a corporation is a citizen of two states: the state in which the corporation is incorporated and the state of its principal place of business. Pastor v. State Farm Mut. Auto. Ins. Co., 487 F.3d 1042, 1047 (7th Cir. 2007); Hertz Corp. v. Friend, 559 U.S. 77, 93 (2010). Defendants should specifically identify the citizenship of each defendant. Defendants shall file a jurisdictional supplement to its notice of removal, as a separate docket entry in this case. The jurisdictional supplement is due on or before 11/23/20. If Defendants do not file the jurisdictional supplement, this case may be sua sponte remanded. Mailed notice. (dm, )
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendants' unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to complaint #4 is granted. Defendants shall respond by 12/6/20. On or before 1/8/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (lma, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MICHAEL JERINIC by Megan Shannon (Shannon, Megan)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MICHAEL JERINIC by Catherine T Mitchell (Mitchell, Catherine)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MICHAEL JERINIC by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MICHAEL JERINIC by Ryan F Stephan (Stephan, Ryan)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION by Defendants Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com, LLC for extension of time to file answer [Unopposed] (Herrington, Elizabeth)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herrington, Elizabeth)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com, LLC by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington (Herrington, Elizabeth)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Circuit Court, case number (2020CH06036) filed by Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17599096. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Herrington, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerinic v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Brooke Herrington
Represented By: Raechel Keay Kummer
Represented By: Clara Kollm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Brooke Herrington
Represented By: Raechel Keay Kummer
Represented By: Clara Kollm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL JERINIC
Represented By: Catherine T Mitchell
Represented By: Megan Shannon
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?