Shelton v. Resurrection University et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Shelton
Defendant: EPMG of Illinois, Bryan Lassner, Resurrection University, Scott Sherman, UNITED STATES, West Suburban Medical Center, Logesh Dharmar, Polina Zaystev, Resurrection University doing business as West Suburban Medical Center, Kyle Geissler and PCC Community Wellness Center
Case Number: 1:2020cv06796
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 15 REMAND with certified copy of order dated 12/4/2020 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (mc, )
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER :The Court grants Plaintiff Shelton's motion to amend #13 and amends its 12/2/2020 minute entry #12 as follows: The Court dismisses the case as to Defendants United States, PCC Community Wellness Center, and Kyle Geissler due to Plaintiff Shelton's failure to exhaust administrative remedies; the Court remands the case as to Defendants VHS West Suburban Medical Center, Inc., PipelineWest Suburban Medical Center, LLC, Polina Zaytsev, Logesh Dharmar, Scott Sherman, Bryan Lassner, and EPMG of Illinois, LLC to state court for further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to remand this case to State Court forthwith. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/4/2020. Mailed notice(mc, )
December 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Thomas Shelton to amend/correct Order (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Gilbreth, David)
December 2, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephonic motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court grants the Government's motion to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies #6 . Plaintiff may refile his federal suit if he first exhausts his administrative remedies within the statute of limitations. Civil case terminated.Mailed notice(maf)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Logesh Dharmar, EPMG of Illinois, Scott Sherman by Patrick Joseph O'Connor (O'Connor, Patrick)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Logesh Dharmar, EPMG of Illinois, Scott Sherman by Robert L. Nora (Nora, Robert)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Thomas Shelton by David E. Gilbreth (Gilbreth, David)
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference set for 12/2/20 at 9:15 a.m. re: MOTION by Unknown United States, Defendants Kyle Geissler, PCC Community Wellness Center to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies #6 . Notice of presentment set for 11/25/20 is vacated. Dial in information will be provided. Mailed notice(maf)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Paraisia Rene Winston Gray for presentment of motion to dismiss #6 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/25/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Winston Gray, Paraisia)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Unknown United States, Defendants Kyle Geissler, PCC Community Wellness Center to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies (Winston Gray, Paraisia)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service of Notice of Removal and Substitution by Paraisia Rene Winston Gray on behalf of Kyle Geissler, PCC Community Wellness Center, United States (Winston Gray, Paraisia)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (mc, )
November 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Paraisia Rene Winston Gray as U.S. Attorney for Defendant UNITED STATES (Winston Gray, Paraisia)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020 L 6834) filed by UNITED STATES (Winston Gray, Paraisia)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Winston Gray, Paraisia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. Resurrection University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Shelton
Represented By: David E. Gilbreth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPMG of Illinois
Represented By: Patrick Joseph O'Connor
Represented By: Robert L. Nora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Lassner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurrection University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Sherman
Represented By: Patrick Joseph O'Connor
Represented By: Robert L. Nora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Paraisia Rene Winston Gray
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Suburban Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logesh Dharmar
Represented By: Patrick Joseph O'Connor
Represented By: Robert L. Nora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polina Zaystev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurrection University doing business as West Suburban Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Geissler
Represented By: Paraisia Rene Winston Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCC Community Wellness Center
Represented By: Paraisia Rene Winston Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?