Donald v. City of Chicago
Plaintiff: Cynthia Donald
Defendant: Eddie Johnson and CITY OF CHICAGO
Case Number: 1:2020cv06815
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 27 Defendant Eddie Johnson's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Eddie Johnson(Leonard, Michael)
January 15, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Mark J. Bereyso for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #25 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/21/2021 at 09:45 AM. (Bereyso, Mark)
January 15, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant City Of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Bereyso, Mark)
December 16, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Susan Margaret O'Keefe of Change of Address (O'Keefe, Susan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Mark J. Bereyso of Change of Address (Bereyso, Mark)
December 10, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant Eddie Johnson's agreed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead #21 is granted to 1/15/2021. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
December 9, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant Eddie Johnson for extension of time to file answer Agreed Motion (Leonard, Michael)
December 8, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion to withdraw as counsel for Defendant City #18 is granted. Attorney Amy Lynne Brammell is terminated. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Amy Lynne Brammell for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #18 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/10/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Brammell, Amy)
December 4, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION by Attorney Amy Brammell to withdraw as attorney for City Of Chicago. No party information provided (Brammell, Amy)
December 2, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eddie Johnson by Rebecca Susan Chacko (Chacko, Rebecca)
December 2, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eddie Johnson by Michael Irving Leonard (Leonard, Michael)
November 25, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Eddie Johnson (kl, )
November 25, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant City of Chicago's motion for extension of time to respond to complaint #7 is granted. Scheduling Conference set for 2/12/2021 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only; no appearance required). The joint Rule 26(f) planning report is due 2/5/2021. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The court will enter a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
November 20, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cynthia Donald by John Backes Prior (Prior, John)
November 20, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cynthia Donald by Carter David Grant (Grant, Carter)
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cynthia Donald by Brian H Eldridge (Eldridge, Brian)
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cynthia Donald by Robert John McLaughlin (McLaughlin, Robert)
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cynthia Donald by Steven Alan Hart (Hart, Steven)
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Mark J. Bereyso for presentment of extension of time #7 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/25/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Bereyso, Mark)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time to Respond to Complaint (Bereyso, Mark)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Susan Margaret O'Keefe (O'Keefe, Susan)
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (nsf, )
November 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
November 17, 2020 NEW PARTIES: Eddie Johnson added to case caption. (Brammell, Amy)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CITY OF CHICAGO by Amy Lynne Brammell (Brammell, Amy)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CITY OF CHICAGO by Mark J. Bereyso (Bereyso, Mark)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bereyso, Mark)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (20 L 010986) filed by CITY OF CHICAGO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bereyso, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donald v. City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Johnson
Represented By: Michael Irving Leonard
Represented By: Rebecca Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Amy Lynne Brammell
Represented By: Mark J. Bereyso
Represented By: Susan Margaret O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Donald
Represented By: John Backes Prior
Represented By: Robert J McLaughlin
Represented By: Carter David Grant
Represented By: Robert John McLaughlin
Represented By: Steven Alan Hart
Represented By: Brian H Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?