Stukes v. Figliulo et al
Plaintiff: Donald A. Stukes
Defendant: James Figliulo, Richard Belniak, Martin Dooley and Rick Belniak
Case Number: 1:2020cv06853
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 FINAL Closing Order dated 12/23/2020 entered on USBC Docket. (jh, )
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court grants Defendants' motion to vacate #6 . The Court vacates its withdrawal of the reference to the Bankruptcy Court and refers the matter back to the Bankruptcy Court so that the court may rule on the parties' pending settlement. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to provide a copy of this order to the Northern District of Illinois Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/23/2020. Mailed notice. (lw, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew R. Barrett for presentment of motion to vacate #6 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 1/27/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Barrett, Matthew)
December 23, 2020 MAILED to the Northern District of Illinois Bankruptcy Court Clerks' Office a copy of the order dated 12/23/2020 #8 . (lw, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendants Richard Belniak, Martin Dooley to vacate the Prior Withdrawal of the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court and to Refer the Matter to the Bankruptcy Court for Purposes of Approving Settlement (Barrett, Matthew)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference set for 1/27/21 at 9:00 a.m. re: motion to withdraw the reference #1 . Dial in information for 1/27/21 at 9:00 a.m. is as follows: 8886848852 or 2154460155,access code: 9582710#. Security code (if asked): 8115. Mailed notice(maf)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 9:00 a.m. re: motion to withdraw the reference #1 . Dial in information for 12/22/20 at 9:00 a.m. is as follows: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Security code (if asked): 8115. Mailed notice(maf)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER dated 11/24/2020, #3 entered on USBC docket. (jh, )
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 5011, the Court grants Defendants' motion to withdraw reference #1 . Defendants demand a jury trial and have not consented to a jury trial in bankruptcy court. See 28 U.S.C. 157(e). Accordingly, the Court withdraws reference of the pending adversary proceeding. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to provide a copy of this order to the Northern District of Illinois Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/24/2020. Mailed notice (jh, )
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8010) (jh, )
November 24, 2020 FORWARD Order dated 11/24/2020 to the Northern District of Illinois Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. (jh, )
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to withdraw reference (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet)(USBC-Rivera, )
November 19, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stukes v. Figliulo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Figliulo
Represented By: Michael K. Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Belniak
Represented By: Matthew R. Barrett
Represented By: Eric S. Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Dooley
Represented By: Matthew R. Barrett
Represented By: Eric S. Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Belniak
Represented By: Matthew R. Barrett
Represented By: Eric S. Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A. Stukes
Represented By: Phillip J. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?