Masullo et al v. IQ Data International Inc.
Plaintiff: Lauren E. Yanouzas and Michael Masullo
Defendant: IQ Data International Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06871
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant IQ Data International Inc. by Krista Rose Easom (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Easom, Krista)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant IQ Data International Inc. by Paul Gamboa (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gamboa, Paul)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Masullo, Lauren E. Yanouzas. IQ Data International Inc. waiver sent on 11/30/2020, answer due 1/29/2021. (Metroff, Victor)
November 19, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ke, )
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michael Masullo, Lauren E. Yanouzas by Mohammed Omar Badwan (Badwan, Mohammed)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michael Masullo, Lauren E. Yanouzas by Victor Thomas Metroff (Metroff, Victor)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Masullo, Lauren E. Yanouzas; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17664779. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Metroff, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masullo et al v. IQ Data International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren E. Yanouzas
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan
Represented By: Victor Thomas Metroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Masullo
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan
Represented By: Victor Thomas Metroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IQ Data International Inc.
Represented By: Paul Gamboa
Represented By: Krista Rose Easom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?