George v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin George
Defendant: Sergio Corona, Bilos, Unknown Chicago Police Officers, CITY OF CHICAGO, Joseph Ferrara, James Gardiner, Solomon Ing, Ortiz, Peter Palka, Charles Sikanich and Daniel Smith
Case Number: 1:2020cv06911
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Benjamin George by Ashley Nicole Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Ashley)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Attorney Brittany Shaw's motion for leave to withdraw #58 is granted. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION by Attorney Brittany J. Shaw to withdraw as attorney for Benjamin George. No party information provided (Shaw, Brittany)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Attorney Joi Kamper's motion to withdraw #56 is granted. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION by Attorney Joi Kamper to withdraw as attorney for City Of Chicago. No party information provided (Kamper, Joi)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Attorney Nicholas T. Peluso's motion to withdraw #53 is granted. Motion hearing set for 8/26/2021 is stricken. Mailed notice (gel, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas Tyler Peluso for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #53 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/26/2021 at 11:00 AM. (Peluso, Nicholas)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION by Attorney Nicholas T. Peluso to withdraw as attorney for City Of Chicago. No party information provided (Peluso, Nicholas)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPLY by Defendants Bilos, City Of Chicago, Sergio Corona, Joseph Ferrara, Solomon Ing, Peter Palka, Daniel Smith in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss (Bammel, Emily)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court grants the unopposed motion for extension filed by Defendants Ing and Corona #48 ; these Defendants shall file their reply by 5/21/21. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPLY by James Gardiner to response in opposition to motion #47 [and Charles Sikanich] (Carroll, Thomas)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPLY by City Of Chicago to response in opposition to motion #46 (Fronczak, Caroline)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION by Defendants Bilos, City Of Chicago, Sergio Corona, Joseph Ferrara, Solomon Ing, Peter Palka, Daniel Smith for extension of time to file reply UNOPPOSED (Perrone, Nicholas)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE by Benjamin Georgein Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant James Gardiner and Defendant Charles Sikanich #42 (Massoglia, Daniel)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE by Benjamin Georgein Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant City Of Chicago #41 (Massoglia, Daniel)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE by Benjamin Georgein Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Bilos, City Of Chicago, Sergio Corona, Joseph Ferrara, Solomon Ing, Peter Palka, Daniel Smith Amended Complaint - CORRECTING PARTY ERROR ON DKT. 39 #40 (Massoglia, Daniel)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendants James Gardiner and Charles Sikanich's motion to dismiss #42 shall be briefed on the same schedule as the other pending motions to dismiss #40 #41 ; Plaintiff shall respond by 4/30/21, and Defendants shall file any reply by 5/14/21. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: In light of the amended complaint #37 , the Court denies as moot Defendants' motions to dismiss the prior complaint #31 , #32 , #35 . Additionally, in light of the corrected motion #40 , the Court denies as moot the initial motion #39 . Plaintiff shall respond to the current motions to dismiss #40 , #41 by 4/30/21, and Defendants shall file any replies by 5/14/21. Mailed notice. (dm, )
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant James Gardiner and Defendant Charles Sikanich (Carroll, Thomas)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant City Of Chicago (Kamper, Joi)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Bilos, City Of Chicago, Sergio Corona, Joseph Ferrara, Solomon Ing, Peter Palka, Daniel Smith Amended Complaint - CORRECTING PARTY ERROR ON DKT. 39 (Beck, Gregory)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Bilos, Joseph Ferrara, Peter Palka, Daniel Smith Amended Complaint (Beck, Gregory)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sergio Corona, Solomon Ing by Nicholas John Perrone (Perrone, Nicholas)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 First AMENDED complaint by Benjamin George against All Defendants (correcting party error on Dkt. 36) (Massoglia, Daniel)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 First AMENDED complaint by Benjamin George against Benjamin George (Massoglia, Daniel)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant James Gardiner and Defendant Charles Sikanich (Carroll, Thomas)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's motions to dismiss #31 and #32 . Plaintiff is advised to review the Court's Standing Order on Motions to Dismiss, which is available on the Court's homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Consistent with the purpose of the Federal Rules "to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, this Court's Standing Order requires Plaintiff to make an election as to whether Plaintiff will amend the complaint under Rule 15(a)(1), or stand on the current complaint and proceed with briefing on the motion to dismiss. To this end, Plaintiff shall file either: (1) an amended complaint within the time limit set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B) by 3/12/2021 or (2) a response to the motion to dismiss by 3/19/2021. If Plaintiff files a response, Defendant shall file a reply by 4/2/2021. If Plaintiff elects to amend its pleading in response to the motion to dismiss, then Defendant shall file within 21 days of the amended pleading either: (1) an answer; or (2) a revised motion to dismiss. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time #30 is granted and answer shall be filed on or before 2/25/2021. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant City Of Chicago (Kamper, Joi)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Bilos, City Of Chicago, Sergio Corona, Joseph Ferrara, Solomon Ing, Peter Palka, Daniel Smith (Beck, Gregory)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION by Defendant James Gardiner for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (unopposed) (Carroll, Thomas)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Charles Sikanich by Thomas Delcorps Carroll (Carroll, Thomas)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sergio Corona, Solomon Ing by Jennifer Kristine Bagby (Bagby, Jennifer)
February 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin George as to Charles Sikanich on 2/4/2021, answer due 2/25/2021. (Massoglia, Daniel)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bilos, Joseph Ferrara, Peter Palka, Daniel Smith by Emily Rachel Bammel (Bammel, Emily)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant James Gardiner by Thomas Delcorps Carroll (Carroll, Thomas)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin George as to James Gardiner on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. (Massoglia, Daniel)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sergio Corona, Solomon Ing by Jordan F Yurchich (Yurchich, Jordan)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: A review of the docket shows that summons has not yet been returned executed as to Defendants Gardiner and Sikanich. To allow Defendants to file a single responsive pleading (if appropriate), the Court hereby extends the deadline for all Defendants to answer: Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 2/19/21. The Court will set additional case management dates in a future order. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bilos, Joseph Ferrara, Peter Palka, Daniel Smith by Gregory M. Beck (Beck, Gregory)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #19 is granted and any answer shall be filed on or before 1/25/2021. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time for Named Officer Defendants (Kamper, Joi)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Benjamin George (Massoglia, Daniel)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Charles Sikanich (gw, )
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant James Gardiner (gw, )
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Nicholas Tyler Peluso (Peluso, Nicholas)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin George as to Peter Palka on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (Massoglia, Daniel)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin George as to Sergio Corona on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (Massoglia, Daniel)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin George as to Daniel Smith on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (Massoglia, Daniel)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin George as to Ortiz on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (Massoglia, Daniel)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin George as to Joseph Ferrara on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (Massoglia, Daniel)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin George as to Solomon Ing on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (Massoglia, Daniel)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin George as to Bilos on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (Massoglia, Daniel)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Solomon Ing. (lxk, )
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Benjamin George. City Of Chicago waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Shaw, Brittany)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Caroline Jane Fronczak (Fronczak, Caroline)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Joi Kamper (Kamper, Joi)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Benjamin George by Elizabeth Abouchar Homsy (Homsy, Elizabeth)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 12/21/2020, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Benjamin George by Brittany J. Shaw (Shaw, Brittany)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Bilos (jg, )
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants City Of Chicago, Sergio Corona, Joseph Ferrara, James Gardiner, Ortiz, Peter Palka, Charles Sikanich, Daniel Smith (kl, )
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ke, )
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Benjamin George by Daniel Massoglia (Massoglia, Daniel)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Massoglia, Daniel)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Benjamin George; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17670584.(Massoglia, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Corona
Represented By: Jordan F Yurchich
Represented By: Jennifer Kristine Bagby
Represented By: Nicholas John Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilos
Represented By: Gregory M. Beck
Represented By: Emily Rachel Bammel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chicago Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Caroline Jane Fronczak
Represented By: Joi Kamper
Represented By: Nicholas Tyler Peluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Ferrara
Represented By: Gregory M. Beck
Represented By: Emily Rachel Bammel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gardiner
Represented By: Thomas Delcorps Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solomon Ing
Represented By: Jordan F Yurchich
Represented By: Jennifer Kristine Bagby
Represented By: Nicholas John Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Palka
Represented By: Gregory M. Beck
Represented By: Emily Rachel Bammel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Sikanich
Represented By: Thomas Delcorps Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Smith
Represented By: Gregory M. Beck
Represented By: Emily Rachel Bammel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin George
Represented By: Daniel Massoglia
Represented By: Brittany J. Shaw
Represented By: Elizabeth Abouchar Homsy
Represented By: Ashley Nicole Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?