Palmer v. Dart et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Palmer
Defendant: Dart Thomas, County of Cook, The, Uknown Correctional Officers and Thomas Dart
Case Number: 1:2020cv06914
Filed: November 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to amend/correct #5 is granted. It does not appear from the docket that summonses have been served. The status hearing set for 1/21/2021 #2 is stricken and re-set for 3/4/2021 at 9:15 a.m. Plaintiff is cautioned regarding the requirements of Civil Rule 4(m). Failure to comply with Rule 4(m), or to seek an extension of time to comply with the Rule, will result in the dismissal without prejudice of this suit. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF A LAWSUIT AND REQUEST to Waive Service of Summons sent to Thomas Dart (bg, )
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Tiffany Palmer Initial status report (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing initial status report)(Tyler, Timothy)
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED First Amended Complaint (Tyler, Timothy)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Tiffany Palmer to amend/correct COMPLAINT (Tyler, Timothy)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF A LAWSUIT AND REQUEST to Waive Service of Summons sent to Thomas Dart on 12/1/2020 by Plaintiff Tiffany Palmer. Waiver of service due by 12/31/2020. (ph, )
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF A LAWSUIT AND REQUEST to Waive Service of Summons sent to Toni Preckwinkle on 12/1/2020 by Plaintiff Tiffany Palmer. Waiver of service due by 12/31/2020. (ph, )
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing set for 1/21/2021 at 9:30 a.m. By 1/14/2021, the parties shall file a joint status report using the form on Judge Feinerman's web page on this District's website. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice.(jlj, )
November 30, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants County of Cook, The, Thomas Dart (jg, )
November 23, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
November 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tiffany Palmer ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17671339. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 APPEARANCE)(Tyler, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Dart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dart Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Cook, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uknown Correctional Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Palmer
Represented By: Timothy R. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?