v. Village of Hinsdale
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Village of Hinsdale
Case Number: 1:2020cv06959
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limit #8 is granted. Defendant has leave to file a brief of up to 20 pages in support of its motion to dismiss. Mailed notice (cn).
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Village of Hinsdale for leave to file excess pages (Unopposed) (Long, Brook)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Kathleen Marie Flannery as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Flannery, Kathleen)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer #5 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due on or before 1/25/2021. Mailed notice (cn).
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant Village of Hinsdale for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 or Otherwise Respond (UNOPPOSED) (Long, Brook)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Patrick Walter Johnson as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Johnson, Patrick)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Village of Hinsdale by Brook R. Long (Long, Brook)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Village of Hinsdale by Lawrence R. Desideri (Desideri, Lawrence)
November 24, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Errata Summons)(Lapertosa, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Village of Hinsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Hinsdale
Represented By: Lawrence R. Desideri
Represented By: Brook R. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Max P Lapertosa
Represented By: Patrick Walter Johnson
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?