Peterson v. TTS Granite Inc.
Petitioner: Capital One Financial Corporation, Menard Inc. and Capital One, N.A.
Appellant: Ronald R. Peterson
Appellee: TTS Granite Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06990
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE Entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Capital One, N.A., Capital One Financial Corp, and Menard Inc.'s unopposed motion for leave to file a response to the trustee's motion to reassign cases as related #12 is granted and they are directed to file a response to the trustee's motion #5 on or before 01/28/2021. Mailed notice (axc).
January 13, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION by Movants Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., Menard Inc. for leave to file a Response to the Trustee's Motion to Reassign Cases as Related (UNOPPOSED) (Stromquist, Matthew)
January 13, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movants Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., Menard Inc. by Matthew O'Hair Stromquist (Stromquist, Matthew)
January 13, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movants Capital One, N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Menard Inc. by Jeffrey D. Pilgrim (Pilgrim, Jeffrey)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS Report on Trustee's Motion to Reassign Cases as Related (ECF No. 5) by Ronald R. Peterson (Paulsen, Jeffrey)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court has reviewed the Trustee's Motion to Reassign Cases as Related #5 . The Motion does not indicate whether TTS opposes the Motion to Reassign. By 12/8/2020, the Trustee shall confer with TTS and file a brief status report informing the Court whether TTS opposes the Motion. The Trustee's Motion for Leave to Appeal #2 is entered and continued pending the resolution of the Motion to Reassign #5 . Mailed notice (axc).
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee TTS Granite Inc. by Ryan Todd Schultz (Schultz, Ryan)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Ronald R. Peterson by Ariane R. Holtschlag (Holtschlag, Ariane)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Appellant Ronald R. Peterson to reassign case as related (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ferguson Motion for Leave to Appeal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Capital One Motion for Leave to Appeal)(Paulsen, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letter)(bg, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Ronald R. Peterson by Jeffrey Kimball Paulsen (Paulsen, Jeffrey)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION by Appellant Ronald R. Peterson for leave to appeal (USBC-Rivera, )
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 19 A 522 (Judge Doyle) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit)(USBC-Rivera, )
November 25, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. TTS Granite Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ronald R. Peterson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kimball Paulsen
Represented By: Ariane R. Holtschlag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TTS Granite Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Todd Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Pilgrim
Represented By: Matthew O'Hair Stromquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Menard Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Pilgrim
Represented By: Matthew O'Hair Stromquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Pilgrim
Represented By: Matthew O'Hair Stromquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?