Peterson v. Ferguson Enterprises Inc.
Appellant: Ronald R. Peterson
Appellee: Ferguson Enterprises Inc. d/b/a Ferguson Heating & Cooling
Case Number: 1:2020cv06992
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Appellee's Motion to Stay the Time to Respond to Appellant's Motion for Leave to Appeal #9 is granted. The stay shall remain in effect until Judge Valderrama rules on the motion to reassign pending before him in case no. 20-cv-6990.Mailed notice (lk, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Appellee Ferguson Enterprises Inc. to stay the time to respond to Appellant's Motion for Leave to Appeal (AGREED) (Zanzig, Blair)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. The record in this bankruptcy appeal was entered on the docket on 11/25/2020. The Court reminds the parties that briefing will proceed in accordance with Rule 8009 of the Bankruptcy Rules. If the appellant fails to file a timely brief, this appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution, and if the appellee fails to file a timely brief, the court will proceed without the benefit of its views. The Court also notes that motions for extensions will be disfavored. Mailed notice (lk, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters) (jh, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Ronald R. Peterson by Ariane R. Holtschlag (Holtschlag, Ariane)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Ferguson Enterprises Inc. by Blair Robert Zanzig (Zanzig, Blair)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Ferguson Enterprises Inc. by Reed Heiligman (Heiligman, Reed)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Ronald R. Peterson by Jeffrey Kimball Paulsen (Paulsen, Jeffrey)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION by Appellant Ronald R. Peterson for leave to appeal (USBC-Rivera, )
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 19 A 436 (Judge Doyle) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit)(USBC-Rivera, )
November 25, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Ferguson Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ronald R. Peterson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kimball Paulsen
Represented By: Ariane R. Holtschlag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ferguson Enterprises Inc. d/b/a Ferguson Heating & Cooling
Represented By: Reed Heiligman
Represented By: Blair R. Zanzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?