Taylor v. Norway Star No. 6797 et al
Plaintiff: Della Taylor
Defendant: The City of Chicago, Scott McKenna Star No. 3942, Ronald Norway Star No. 6797, Edwin Utreras Star No. 19901, Unknown and Unnamed City of Chicago Police Officers and Joy McClain Star No. 4915
Case Number: 1:2020cv07001
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Upon review of the joint status report #13 filed on 1/21/2021, Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #11 is granted to and including 2/22/2021. Status hearing and notice of motion date of 1/26/2021 are stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. The Court adopts the parties' proposed discovery plan: initial disclosures under FRCP 26(a)(1) are due by 4/15/2021; fact discovery is to be completed by 10/30/2021. Any motion to dismiss will be briefed as follows: motion filed by 2/22/2021; response due by 3/22/2021; reply due by 4/12/2021. The Court will issue a ruling by mail. If the City files a motion to dismiss the Monell claim, then discovery on Monell will be stayed pending the Court's ruling. All other discovery may proceed. The Court requests that counsel file an interim revised joint status report on the progress of discovery no later than 8/16/2021. Counsel also may contact the Courtroom Deputy at any time to schedule a status hearing and/or request a referral to the Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference. Emailed notice (cdh, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 13 STATUS Report Initial by Della Taylor (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Diaz, Jaclyn)
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Caitlyn Rae Culbertson for presentment of extension of time #11 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 1/26/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Culbertson, Caitlyn)
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant The City of Chicago for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Culbertson, Caitlyn)
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Scott McKenna Star No. 3942 by Elaine Cindy Davenport (Davenport, Elaine)
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Joy McClain Star No. 4915, Ronald Norway Star No. 6797, Edwin Utreras Star No. 19901 by Elaine Cindy Davenport (Davenport, Elaine)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The City of Chicago by Caitlyn Rae Culbertson (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Culbertson, Caitlyn)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The City of Chicago by Anthony George Becknek (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Becknek, Anthony)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The City of Chicago by John A. Wall (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Wall, John)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The City of Chicago by Lance C. Malina (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Malina, Lance)
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial telephone conference is set for 1/26/2021 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and ALL further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, )
November 25, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Della Taylor by Edward M. Fox (Fox, Edward)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Della Taylor by Jaclyn Diaz (Diaz, Jaclyn)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Della Taylor; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17684070. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Diaz, Jaclyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Norway Star No. 6797 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Chicago
Represented By: John A. Wall
Represented By: Caitlyn Rae Culbertson
Represented By: Anthony George Becknek
Represented By: Lance C. Malina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott McKenna Star No. 3942
Represented By: Elaine Cindy Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Norway Star No. 6797
Represented By: Elaine Cindy Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Utreras Star No. 19901
Represented By: Elaine Cindy Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown and Unnamed City of Chicago Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy McClain Star No. 4915
Represented By: Elaine Cindy Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Della Taylor
Represented By: Edward M. Fox
Represented By: Jaclyn Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?