Longo v. Rosebud Farm, Inc.
Appellant: Joseph Longo
Appellee: Rosebud Farm, Inc.
Trustee: Alex D. Moglia
Case Number: 1:2020cv07041
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Joseph Longo by Joseph A. Longo (Longo, Joseph)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Minute entry #8 is corrected as follows. Agreed motion for extension of time #7 is granted. Appellant's brief will be due by 3/1/2021. The joint status report deadline is extended to 3/9/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 20, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Agreed motion for extension of time #7 is granted. Appellant's brief will be due by 2/19/2021. The joint status report deadline is extended to 3/9/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by Appellant Joseph Longo for extension of time (bg, )
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Trustee Alex D. Moglia by Lauren Newman (Newman, Lauren)
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 11/16/2020 regarding Notice of Appeal #4 , #1 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (USBC-Rivera, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant/Appellee Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(USBC-Rivera, )
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By 2/9/2021, the parties are to file a joint status report. The parties may refer to the format detailed on the Court's website under New and Reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letter) (bg, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 18 B 24763 (Judge Barnes) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(USBC-Ross, )
November 30, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longo v. Rosebud Farm, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Joseph Longo
Represented By: Joseph A. Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rosebud Farm, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Alex D. Moglia
Represented By: Lauren Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?