Edelson PC v. Girardi et al
Plaintiff: Edelson PC
Defendant: Abir Cohen Treyzon Salo, LLP, John Doe 1-10, Johnston Hutchinson & Lira LLP, Robert Finnerty, EJ Global LLC, Girardi Financial, Inc., Keith Griffin, Stillwell Madison, LLC, David Lira, Erika Girardi, Thomas Girardi, California Attorney Lending II, Inc. and Girardi Keese
Case Number: 1:2020cv07115
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motions by Griffin #123 , Lira #132 , and Edelson PC #137 to file materials under seal are granted. Complete versions, including all exhibits, are to be filed under seal, and redacted versions are to be filed in the public record. Response to plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended complaint #136 is to be filed by 4/11/2022. Telephonic hearing on motion is set for 4/14/2022 at 9:05 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. The Court reserves the right to vacate the hearing if it determines a hearing is not needed. (mk)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 CERTIFICATE of Service by Alexander Glenn Tievsky on behalf of Edelson PC regarding SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC for leave to file First Amended Complaint #135 (Tievsky, Alexander)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC to seal document SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC for leave to file First Amended Complaint #135 (Tievsky, Alexander)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC for leave to file First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Tievsky, Alexander)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC for leave to file First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Tievsky, Alexander)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report. Plaintiff's response to defendants' motions for summary judgment is to be filed by 4/22/2022; defendants' replies are to be filed by 5/6/2022. Regarding the discovery schedule, the Court is extending the current deadlines by 60 days. This is without prejudice to a request for a further extension if the Court allows filing of an amended complaint following receipt of the anticipated motion to amend on which the filing deadline remains 4/4/2022. The new discovery deadlines are as follows. Fact discovery is to be completed by 5/27/2022. Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures by the part with the burden of proof on an issue are to be served by 6/21/2022. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures are to be served by 7/26/2022. The deadline for completing expert depositions is 9/9/2022. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is 9/23/2022. (mk)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STATUS Report Joint by Edelson PC (Wade Scott, J.)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION by Defendant David Lira to seal document exhibit #131 (Robie, Leigh)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant David Lira Exhibit 3 regarding MOTION by Defendant David Lira for summary judgment or Partial Summary Judgment #130 (Robie, Leigh)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION by Defendant David Lira for summary judgment or Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of David R. Lira, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Declaration of Leigh Robie, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Statement of Material Facts)(Robie, Leigh)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic motion hearing held on 3/21/2022. Plaintiff's motion to compel defendant Griffin #114 #116 and motion to compel defendant Lira #113 are granted in part and denied in part as stated on the record. Defendant's motion for protective order #119 is denied. Defendant Lira's motion to compel #118 is denied. Any documents obtained by any party pursuant to subpoena are to be promptly turned over to all other parties. By no later than 3/28/2022, the parties are directed to file a joint status report regarding an appropriate briefing schedule on the defendants' summary judgment motions and a revised discovery schedule. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time #111 is granted. Deadline for motions to amend the pleadings and adding parties is extended to 4/4/2022. A telephonic status hearing is set for 5/5/2022 at 8:40 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Mailed notice. (mma, )
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 RESPONSE by David Lirain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC to compel Defendant Lira #113 to Produce Additional Documents and to Provide Additional Information Regarding His Privilege Log (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leigh Robie, #2 Exhibit 1)(Robie, Leigh)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RESPONSE by Edelson PC to MOTION by Defendant David Lira for protective order MOTION by Defendant David Lira to quash Subpoenas #119 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wade Scott, J.)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE by Edelson PC to MOTION by Defendant David Lira to compel Further Responses to Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production of Documents from Plaintiff Edelson PC #118 (Wade Scott, J.)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM by Keith Griffin in Opposition to motion to compel, #114 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith Griffin)(Saba, Ryan)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion to file exhibits to motion to compel under seal #115 is granted. Plaintiff is directed to file a complete version of the motion, including all exhibits, under seal unless plaintiff has already done so. Responses to discovery-related motions #119 #118 #116 #114 #113 are to be filed by 3/18/2022. Telephonic hearing on those motions is set for 3/21/2022 at 9:45 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Telephonic status hearing set for 9:15 AM on 3/21/2022 is moved to 9:45 AM on that date. (mk)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION by Defendant Keith Griffin to seal document exhibit #122 (Saba, Ryan)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Keith Griffin Exhibit 3 regarding MOTION by Defendant Keith Griffin for summary judgment or partial summary judgment #121 (Saba, Ryan)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION by Defendant Keith Griffin for summary judgment or partial summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Keith Griffin, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Declaration of Ryan Saba, #6 Exhibit 3 - Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Statement of Material Fact)(Saba, Ryan)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Request for Judicial Notice by David Lira In Support of Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13, #2 Exhibit 14)(Robie, Leigh)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION by Defendant David Lira for protective order , MOTION by Defendant David Lira to quash Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Leigh Robie, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Robie, Leigh)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION by Defendant David Lira to compel Further Responses to Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production of Documents from Plaintiff Edelson PC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Leigh Robie, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Robie, Leigh)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 CERTIFICATE of Service by J. Eli Wade Scott on behalf of Edelson PC regarding SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC to Compel Defendant Griffin #116 (Wade Scott, J.)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC to Compel Defendant Griffin (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of J. Eli Wade-Scott, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Wade Scott, J.)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC to seal Exhibits to Motion to Compel Defendant Griffin (Wade Scott, J.)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC to compel Defendant Griffin (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of J. Eli Wade-Scott, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J (filed under seal), #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M (filed under seal))(Wade Scott, J.)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC to compel Defendant Lira (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of J. Eli Wade-Scott, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Wade Scott, J.)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 2/28/2022. Deadline for any motions to compel relating to written discovery is 3/14/2022. A telephonic status hearing is set for 3/21/2022 at 9:15 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Mailed notice. (mma, )
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC for extension of time to amend (Wade Scott, J.)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STATUS Report JOINT by Edelson PC (Wade Scott, J.)
January 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to stipulation, plaintiff's claims against defendants EJ Global LLC and Erika Girardi are dismissed without prejudice and without costs. (mk)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice of claims against Defendants Erika Girardi and EJ Global LLC (Wade Scott, J.)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic motion hearing held on 1/26/2022. Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve Erika Girardi #103 is terminated without prejudice for the reasons stated on the record. Mailed notice. (mma, )
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/21/2022: Agreed motion for entry of confidentiality order is granted #105 . (mk)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC for Entry of Agreed Confidentiality Order (Wade Scott, J.)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve Erika Girardi with summons #103 , which amounts to a motion to extend the time for service on Ms. Girardi, is set for a telephonic hearing on 1/26/2022 at 9:00 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff is directed to promptly transmit a copy of this order to the attorney(s), if any, who plaintiff understands to be representing Ms. Girardi in this matter or the bankruptcy matter referenced in the motion. (mk)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC for Leave to Serve Erika Girardi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of Alexander Tievsky)(Tievsky, Alexander)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Based on the parties' joint status report, the telephonic status hearing set for 1/6/2022 is vacated and reset to 2/28/2022 at 9:20 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. A detailed status report regarding discovery (including details on what remains to be done) is to be filed on 2/22/2022. (mk)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STATUS Report Joint by Edelson PC (Wade Scott, J.)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Edelson PC by Angela Nicole Reilly (Reilly, Angela)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE by Ryan Donald Saba of Change of Address (Saba, Ryan)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 11/3/2021 and continued to 1/6/2022 at 8:45 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852 conference code 746-1053. By no later than 12/30/2021, the parties are directed to file a detailed joint status report regarding discovery. Mailed notice. (mma, )
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 8/31/2021. Defendant Griffin's motion for judgment on the pleadings #95 is denied without prejudice, pursuant to the filing of a proper motion for summary judgment. Deadline for amending the pleadings and adding parties is 2/25/2022. The deadline for completing fact discovery is 3/28/2022. The deadline for Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures is 4/22/2022. Deadline for rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures is 5/27/2022. The expert discovery deadline is 7/11/2022. The dispositive motion deadline is 7/25/2022. A telephonic status hearing is set for 11/3/2021 at 8:45 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852 conference code 746-1053. Mailed notice. (mma, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Edelson PC by J. Eli Wade Scott (Wade Scott, J.)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION by Defendant Keith Griffin for judgment on the pleadings (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan Saba, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Saba, Ryan)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STATUS Report (joint) by Edelson PC (Tievsky, Alexander)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by David Lira(Matthai, Edith)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Keith Griffin(Saba, Ryan)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/19/2021: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies Griffin's motion to dismiss [dkt. no. 41] and grants Lira's motion to dismiss [dkt. no. 43] in part, staying litigation on Count 1 (Unjust Enrichment - Constructive Trust) under 11 U.S.C. 362(a)(3) unless and until the conclusion of the Girardi and Girardi Keese bankruptcy proceedings or until the bankruptcy court orders otherwise. Both defendants are directed to answer all remaining claims by no later than August 9, 2021. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures, unless already made, are to be made by August 16, 2021. The parties are directed to confer and attempt to agree upon a discovery and pretrial schedule and are to file by August 23, 2021 a joint status report setting out an agreed schedule or alternative proposed schedules. The case is set for a telephone status hearing on August 31, 2021 at 8:45 a.m., using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053, though the Court reserves the right to vacate the status hearing if it determines a hearing is not needed. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. (mk)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 RESPONSE by David Lirain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC for leave to file supplemental authority #86 (Matthai, Edith)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REPLY by David Lira to MOTION by Defendant David Lira to dismiss for lack of standing, lack of venue and failure to state a claim #43 Amended Reply ISO Motion to Dismiss (Matthai, Edith)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic motion hearing held on 5/21/2021. The plaintiff's motion to file a surreply #82 is denied due to the issue on which a surreply was requested has been forfeited. The reply and supporting materials filed by Mr. Lira are withdrawn. The defendant has leave to file a revised reply by 5/28/2021. Plaintiff's motion to strike #83 is terminated as moot for the reasons stated on the record. Mailed notice. (mma, )
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 RESPONSE by David Lirain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC to strike reply #81 declaration of David Lira and portions of brief in reply that rely on that declaration #83 (Matthai, Edith)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC for leave to file supplemental authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tievsky, Alexander)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 RESPONSE by Keith Griffinin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC for leave to file sur-reply to Defendant Keith Griffin's reply in support of his motion to dismiss #80 #82 (Saba, Ryan)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motions to strike #83 and for leave to file surreply #82 are set for hearing on 5/21/2021 at 9:20 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. Any written response to the motion is to be filed by 5/19/2021. (mk)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC to strike reply #81 declaration of David Lira and portions of brief in reply that rely on that declaration (Tievsky, Alexander)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC for leave to file sur-reply to Defendant Keith Griffin's reply in support of his motion to dismiss #80 (Tievsky, Alexander)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPLY by Defendant David Lira to motion to dismiss #43 (Attachments: #1 Declaration David Lira Declaration in Support of Reply)(Matthai, Edith)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPLY by Defendant Keith Griffin to response in opposition to motion, #77 (Saba, Ryan)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CERTIFICATE of Service by Alexander Glenn Tievsky on behalf of Edelson PC regarding sealed response, #78 (Tievsky, Alexander)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SEALED RESPONSE by Edelson PC to MOTION by Defendant Keith Griffin to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #41 , MOTION by Defendant David Lira to dismiss for lack of standing, lack of venue and failure to state a claim #43 (documents sealed pursuant to dkt. 58) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Tievsky, Alexander)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE by Edelson PCin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Keith Griffin to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #41 , MOTION by Defendant David Lira to dismiss for lack of standing, lack of venue and failure to state a claim #43 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (filed under seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (redacted version), #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Tievsky, Alexander)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a 25-page consolidated brief #75 is granted. (mk)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC for leave to file excess pages in opposition to David Lira's and Keith Griffin's motions to dismiss (Tievsky, Alexander)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE by Rafey S. Balabanian of Change of Address (Balabanian, Rafey)
April 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion to take depositions #49 #57 , which the Court previously denied as to defendant Keith Griffin, is now denied as to defendant David Lira as well. Lira has filed an affidavit in support of his motion to dismiss, see dkt. no. 44-1, but it addresses only one or two apparently undisputed matters, namely Lira's state of rresidence and his status as a salaried W-2 employee of Girardi Keese. Lira's motion to dismiss turns on other, legal issues, including whether plaintiff has standing; the legal sufficiency of the complaint's allegations to state a claim against Lira; the effect of the pending bankruptcy of Girardi Keese; Lira's entitlement to indemnification; and the appropriateness of venue. In addressing these points--in particular the fourth--the Court is called upon, at this point, to evaluate legal matters, including the nature and effect of plaintiff's allegations regarding Lira, the applicability of a California statute given those allegations, and the effect on the present case of Lira's claimed right to indemnification from Girardi Keese, a debtor in bankruptcy. Taking Lira's deposition is not called for given the issues before the Court. The briefing schedule on Lira's motion to dismiss will be the same as on defendant Griffin's motion to dismiss: plaintiff's response is to be filed by 4/27/2021, and defendant's reply is to be filed by 5/11/2021. The telephonic status hearing set for 4/27/2021 is vacated. (mk)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status and ruling on a motion hearing held on 4/6/2021. The motion to take the deposition #49 #57 are denied as to defendant Griffin. The motions are taken under advisement as to defendant Lira. Response to Griffin's motion to dismiss #41 #42 is due 4/27/2021; reply is due 5/11/2021. A telephonic status hearing is set for 4/27/2021 at 9:15 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852 conference code 746-1053. Mailed notice. (mma, )
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant Griffin's motion for leave to file #70 is granted. (mk)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION by Defendant Keith Griffin for leave to file a response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Authority (Saba, Ryan)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion for leave to file supplemental authority #67 is granted. (mk)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the telephonic status and motion hearing set for 3/31/2021 is vacacted and reset to 4/6/2021 at 9:40 AM. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852 conference code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. (mk)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC for leave to file supplemental authority (Attachments: #1 Ford Motor Co. v. Montana Eighth Judicial District Court)(Tievsky, Alexander)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPLY by Plaintiff Edelson PC to motion to take deposition #49 (Tievsky, Alexander)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RESPONSE by David Lirain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC to take deposition of Keith Griffin and David Lira #49 (Sheean, Christopher)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM by Keith Griffin in Opposition to motion to take deposition #49 (Saba, Ryan)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motions by Caroline Vickrey and Joseph Marconi o withdraw as attorneys for defendant Johnston Hutchinson & Lira LLP #61 #62 are granted because the defendant has been dismissed as a party. (mk)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION by Attorney Joseph R. Marconi to withdraw as attorney for Johnston Hutchinson & Lira LLP. New address information: Johnston Hutchinson & Lira, LLP, 350 S. Grand Ave., Suite 2220, Los Angeles, CA 90071 (Attachments: #1 Notification of Party Contact Information)(Marconi, Joseph)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION by Attorney Caroline K. Vickrey to withdraw as attorney for Johnston Hutchinson & Lira LLP. New address information: Johnston Hutchinson & Lira, LLP, 350 S. Grand Ave., Suite 2220, Los Angeles, CA 90071 (Attachments: #1 Notification of Party Contact Information)(Vickrey, Caroline)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The briefing schedule on defendants' motions to dismiss is vacated and will be reset once the Court rules on the pending dispute regarding jurisdictional discovery. (mk)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC to vacate briefing schedule on Defendants' motions to dismiss (Tievsky, Alexander)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 3/5/2021. Plaintiff has leave to file their motion to take deposition of Keith Griffin and David Lira #49 , in its entirety, under seal. Defendants' response is due 3/15/2021; plaintiff's reply is due 3/22/2021. A telephonic status and ruling on the motion hearings are set for 3/31/2021 at 9:20 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852 conference code 746-1053. Mailed notice. (mma, )
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC (refiled as single docket entry at request of Court) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Tievsky, Alexander)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Edelson PC by Rafey S. Balabanian (Balabanian, Rafey)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion to file documents under seal #54 is granted. (mk)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC to seal document sealed document #50 , sealed document #51 , sealed document #52 (Tievsky, Alexander)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CERTIFICATE of Service by Alexander Glenn Tievsky on behalf of Edelson PC regarding sealed document #50 , sealed document #51 , sealed document #52 (Tievsky, Alexander)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Edelson PC Lion AIr settlement accounting filed provisionally under seal (Tievsky, Alexander)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Edelson PC Declaration of Keith Griffin filed provisionally under seal (Tievsky, Alexander)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Edelson PC Declaration of David Lira filed provisionally under seal (Tievsky, Alexander)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC to take deposition of Keith Griffin and David Lira (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Tievsky, Alexander)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 2/22/2021. The case is stayed as to defendants Girardi and Girardi Keese due to their filing of petitions for bankruptcy. The plaintiff's response regarding both motions to dismiss is to be filed by 3/22/2021. Defendants' replies are due 4/5/2021. The parties are directed to immediately confer regarding jurisdictional and venue discovery. Any motions relating to any dispute over jurisdictional discovery are to be filed by 3/4/2021. A telephonic status hearing is set for 3/5/2021 at 9:00 a.m. The following call in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Mailed notice. (mma, )
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 DEFENDANT DAVID LIRA'S NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DECLARATION OF DAVID LIRA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), AND 12(b)(6) by David Lira (Robie, Leigh)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STATUS Report (joint) by Edelson PC (Tievsky, Alexander)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE by John Andrew O'Donnell of Change of Address (O'Donnell, John)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM by David Lira in support of motion to dismiss #43 (Attachments: #1 Declaration David Lira, #2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice)(Sheean, Christopher)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION by Defendant David Lira to dismiss for lack of standing, lack of venue and failure to state a claim (Sheean, Christopher)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION by Defendant Keith Griffin to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan Saba, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Affidavit of Keith Griffin)(Saba, Ryan)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION by Defendant Keith Griffin to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Saba, Ryan)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion for entry of default #38 is granted; defendants EJ Global, LLC and Girardi Financial, Inc. are held in default for failure to respond to the complaint following service of summons. (mk)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 2/16/2021, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 (a "status hearing," in local parlance) on 2/22/2021 at 9:20 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC for entry of default as to EJ Global, LLC and Girardi Financial, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tievsky, Alexander)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy as to Thomas Girardi and Girardi Keese (Tievsky, Alexander)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edelson PC as to Girardi Financial, Inc. on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Tievsky, Alexander)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edelson PC as to EJ Global LLC on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Tievsky, Alexander)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to stipulation, plaintiff's claims against defendant Johnston Hutchinson & Lira LLP are dismissed without prejudice. Motions by defendants Griffin and Lira for extension of time #32 #33 are granted; due date for responses to complaint is extended to 2/12/2021. (mk)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION by Defendant David Lira for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Matthai, Edith)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION by Defendant Keith Griffin for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Saba, Ryan)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Johnston, Hutchinson & Lira, LLP, Without Prejudice (Vickrey, Caroline)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's claims against defendants Abir Cohen Treyzon Salo, LLP and Robert Finnerty are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to stipulation. Plaintiff's claims against defendant California Attorney Lending II, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to stipulation. (mk)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice of claims against California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Tievsky, Alexander)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice of claims against Defendants Abir Cohen Treyzon Salo, LLP and Robert Finnerty (Tievsky, Alexander)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion of Ryan D. Saba to appear pro hac vice #24 is granted. (mk)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Keith Griffin by Ryan Donald Saba Corrected (Saba, Ryan)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Keith Griffin by Ryan Donald Saba (Saba, Ryan)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17800941. for Keith Griffin (Saba, Ryan)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant Griffin's unopposed motion for extension of time #22 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 1/29/2021. (mk)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION by Defendant Keith Griffin for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 or otherwise plead (O'Donnell, John)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Johnston Hutchinson & Lira LLP by Joseph R. Marconi (Marconi, Joseph)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant Johnston Hutchinson & Lira's unopposed motion for extension of time #19 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 1/28/2021. (mk)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant Johnston Hutchinson & Lira LLP for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (or Otherwise Plead) (Vickrey, Caroline)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Johnston Hutchinson & Lira LLP by Caroline Kneafsey Vickrey (Vickrey, Caroline)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Keith Griffin by John Andrew O'Donnell (O'Donnell, John)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion of Leigh Robie to appear pro hac vice #15 is granted. (mk)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17788756. (Robie, Leigh)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion for entry of stipulated dismissal #13 is granted. Plaintiff's claims against defendant Stillwell Madison, LLC are dismissed with prejudice and without costs. Motion to sever and dismiss #5 is moot. (mk)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice of claims against Stillwell Madison, LLC (Tievsky, Alexander)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Unopposed motion of David Lira for extension of time #11 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 1/28/2021. (mk)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant David Lira for extension of time to file answer Unopposed (Sheean, Christopher)
December 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion of Edith Matthai to appear pro hac vice #8 is granted. (mk)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant David Lira by Edith Rae Matthai (Matthai, Edith)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17758789. (Matthai, Edith)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant David Lira by Christopher T. Sheean (Sheean, Christopher)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Abir Cohen Treyzon Salo, LLP, California Attorney Lending II, Inc., EJ Global LLC, Robert Finnerty, Erika Girardi, Thomas Girardi, Girardi Financial, Inc., Girardi Keese, Keith Griffin, Johnston Hutchinson & Lira LLP, David Lira. (ng, )
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff wishes to dismiss its with prejudice its claims against one but not all of the defendants in this case. It proposes to sever the claims against that defendant--in other words, make those claims into a separate case--and then dismiss it. The Court questions the appropriateness of a severance under the applicable rules and wonders why plaintiff wishes to proceed in what seems to be the hard way rather than the much easier and common mechanism--a stipulation between plaintiff and the particular defendant for dismissal of the claims against that defendant, something that is done basically every day of the week in this courthouse and elsewhere. The Seventh Circuit case cited by plaintiff concerns only voluntary dismissal by the plaintiff alone and has no bearing on stipulated dismissals of particular claims or defendants. Plaintiff is directed to file a revised motion or a supplement explaining why the Court's suggested mechanism cannot be used. (mk)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC to sever claims against Stillwell Madison, LLC, MOTION by Plaintiff Edelson PC to dismiss severed action against Stillwell Madison, LLC with prejudice (Tievsky, Alexander)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Edelson PC by Alexander Glenn Tievsky (Tievsky, Alexander)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Edelson PC by Jay Edelson (Edelson, Jay)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelson, Jay)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Edelson PC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17698245.(Edelson, Jay)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edelson PC v. Girardi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abir Cohen Treyzon Salo, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnston Hutchinson & Lira LLP
Represented By: Joseph R. Marconi
Represented By: Caroline Kneafsey Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Finnerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EJ Global LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Girardi Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Griffin
Represented By: John Andrew O'Donnell
Represented By: Ryan Donald Saba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stillwell Madison, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lira
Represented By: Edith Rae Matthai
Represented By: Christopher T. Sheean
Represented By: Leigh Porter Robie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Girardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Girardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Attorney Lending II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Girardi Keese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edelson PC
Represented By: Alexander Glenn Tievsky
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Angela Nicole Reilly
Represented By: J. Eli Wade Scott
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?