Prewitt v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Devona Prewitt
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC f/k/a Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janseen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson Research & Development, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07150
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 2:20-cv-20654, filed 12/31/2020. (bg, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 TRANSFERRED to the District of New Jersey, the electronic record. (aee, )
December 29, 2020 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL (2973) Conditional Transfer Order filed 12/29/20. (aee, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to the District of New Jersey. (aee, )
December 3, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (LaCien, Brian)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Devona Prewitt; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17703638.(LaCien, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prewitt v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devona Prewitt
Represented By: Brian LaCien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC f/k/a Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janseen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Research & Development, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?