Birim Group, LLC v. Nduom et al.
Plaintiff: Birim Group, LLC
Defendant: Gold Coast Fund Management, Paa Kwesi Nduom, Dr. Paa Kwesi Nduom, Yvonne Nduom, Francis Baffuor, Groupe Nduom USA LLC, Edjah Nduom, Does 1 through 100, James L Buckner, Papa Kwesi Nduom, Donald Davidson, InternationalBusiness Solutions, LLC, Nana Aba Nduom, Nana Kweku Nduom, Lisa Finch, GN Money LLC, Groupe Nduom, Robert Klamp, William C Goodall, GN USA LLC, Blackshield Capital Management and GN Bank
Case Number: 1:2020cv07198
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 [PROPOSED] First AMENDED complaint by Birim Group, LLC against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Supplement Complaint Redlined)(Mcmillan, Shelly)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint #26 and the U.S. Defendants' response. Plaintiff's motion was not accompanied by a proposed amended complaint. On or before January 6, 2022, Plaintiff shall file two (2) copies of the proposed amended complaint, one clean version and one in redline showing changes from the original complaint. Plaintiff need not file an additional brief along with the proposed amended complaint. The U.S. Defendants are to file their response to the motion for leave to amend by February 1, 2022. Plaintiff is to file its reply by February 11, 2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE by Defendants Francis Baffuor, James L Buckner, Donald Davidson, Lisa Finch, GN Bank, GN Money LLC, William C Goodall, Groupe Nduom USA LLC, InternationalBusiness Solutions, LLC, Robert Klamp, Edjah Nduom, Nana Aba Nduom, Nana Kweku Nduom, Paa Kwesi Nduom, Yvonne Nduom to motion to amend/correct #26 (Andalman, Robert)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff Birim Group, LLC to amend/correct (Asiedu, Kwasi)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the attached order, the U.S. Defendants' motion to dismiss #14 , #15 is granted. The Court also sua sponte dismisses Plaintiff's claims against the non-U.S. Defendants. For the reasons stated above, dismissal of Plaintiff's RICO claims and all claims against GN USA LLC is with prejudice. Plaintiff may move for leave to file an amended complaint if believes it can cure the remaining deficiencies described in this opinion. That motion must be filed within 21 days of this order or dismissal will be with prejudice. Should Plaintiff file a motion for leave, it must be accompanied by a brief of five pages or less explaining why the proposed amended complaint cures the deficiencies mentioned herein. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/23/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Birim Group, LLC by Lucas Thor Rael (Rael, Lucas)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY by Francis Baffuor, James L Buckner, Donald Davidson, Lisa Finch, GN Bank (an Illinois Federally-Chartered Financial Institution), GN Money LLC, William C Goodall, Groupe Nduom USA LLC, InternationalBusiness Solutions, LLC, Robert Klamp, Edjah Nduom, Nana Aba Nduom, Nana Kweku Nduom, Paa Kwesi Nduom, Yvonne Nduom to response in opposition to motion, #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Andalman, Robert)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Birim Group, LLC by Patricia Brown Holmes (Holmes, Patricia)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Birim Group, LLC by Ivan Settimba (Settimba, Ivan)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE by Birim Group, LLCin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Francis Baffuor, James L Buckner, Donald Davidson, Lisa Finch, GN Bank, GN Money LLC, William C Goodall, Groupe Nduom USA LLC, InternationalBusiness Solutions, LLC, Robert Klamp, Edjah Nduom #14 (Mcmillan, Shelly)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for leave to file excess pages #17 is granted. Plaintiff may file a brief not to exceed 35 pages. U.S. Defendants are to file their reply by 6/10/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE by Francis Baffuor, James L Buckner, Donald Davidson, Lisa Finch, GN Bank (an Illinois Federally-Chartered Financial Institution), GN Money LLC, William C Goodall, Groupe Nduom USA LLC, InternationalBusiness Solutions, LLC, Robert Klamp, Edjah Nduom, Nana Aba Nduom, Nana Kweku Nduom, Paa Kwesi Nduom, Yvonne Nduomin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Birim Group, LLC for leave to file excess pages #17 (Meza, Ricardo)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiff Birim Group, LLC for leave to file excess pages (Mcmillan, Shelly)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: No discovery will be permitted until the motion to dismiss is decided. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Francis Baffuor, James L Buckner, Donald Davidson, Lisa Finch, GN Bank, GN Money LLC, William C Goodall, Groupe Nduom USA LLC, InternationalBusiness Solutions, LLC, Robert Klamp, Edjah Nduom, Nana Aba Nduom, Nana Kweku Nduom, Paa Kwesi Nduom, Yvonne Nduom Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Meza, Ricardo)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Francis Baffuor, James L Buckner, Donald Davidson, Lisa Finch, GN Bank, GN Money LLC, William C Goodall, Groupe Nduom USA LLC, InternationalBusiness Solutions, LLC, Robert Klamp, Edjah Nduom, Nana Aba Nduom, Nana Kweku Nduom, Paa Kwesi Nduom, Yvonne Nduom (Meza, Ricardo)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report. The question of discovery taking place while a motion to dismiss is pending will be decided once the motion to dismiss is filed. Until then, no discovery will be allowed. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Birim Group, LLC (Mcmillan, Shelly)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Francis Baffuor, James L Buckner, Donald Davidson, Lisa Finch, GN Bank, GN Money LLC, William C Goodall, Groupe Nduom USA LLC, InternationalBusiness Solutions, LLC, Robert Klamp, Edjah Nduom, Nana Aba Nduom, Nana Kweku Nduom, Paa Kwesi Nduom, Yvonne Nduom by Kristin T. Opal (Opal, Kristin)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Francis Baffuor, James L Buckner, Donald Davidson, Lisa Finch, GN Bank, GN Money LLC, William C Goodall, Groupe Nduom USA LLC, InternationalBusiness Solutions, LLC, Robert Klamp, Edjah Nduom, Nana Aba Nduom, Nana Kweku Nduom, Paa Kwesi Nduom, Yvonne Nduom by Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn (Blackburn, Rachael)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Francis Baffuor, James L Buckner, Donald Davidson, Lisa Finch, GN Bank, GN Money LLC, William C Goodall, Groupe Nduom USA LLC, InternationalBusiness Solutions, LLC, Robert Klamp, Edjah Nduom, Nana Aba Nduom, Nana Kweku Nduom, Paa Kwesi Nduom, Yvonne Nduom by Robert M. Andalman (Andalman, Robert)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #7 is granted. The U.S. Defendants are to answer or otherwise plead by 4/5/2021, and may file a supporting memorandum not to exceed 25 pages. Plaintiff is to respond to the motion to dismiss by 5/20/2021, and may file a response not to exceed 25 pages. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION by Defendants Francis Baffuor, James L Buckner, Donald Davidson, Lisa Finch, GN Bank, GN Money LLC, William C Goodall, Groupe Nduom USA LLC, InternationalBusiness Solutions, LLC, Robert Klamp, Edjah Nduom, Nana Aba Nduom, Nana Kweku Nduom, Paa Kwesi Nduom, Yvonne Nduom for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 and for Leave to File an Oversized Brief (Meza, Ricardo)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Francis Baffuor, James L Buckner, Donald Davidson, Lisa Finch, GN Bank, GN Money LLC, William C Goodall, Groupe Nduom USA LLC, InternationalBusiness Solutions, LLC, Robert Klamp, Edjah Nduom, Nana Aba Nduom, Nana Kweku Nduom, Paa Kwesi Nduom, Yvonne Nduom by Ricardo Meza (Meza, Ricardo)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Birim Group, LLC by Shelly Deidre Mcmillan (Mcmillan, Shelly)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Plaintiff Birim Group, LLC, Defendants James L Buckner, Donald Davidson, Lisa Finch, GN Bank, GN Money LLC, GN USA LLC, Gold Coast Fund Management, William C Goodall, Groupe Nduom, Groupe Nduom USA LLC, InternationalBusiness Solutions, LLC, Robert Klamp, Edjah Nduom, Nana Aba Nduom, Nana Kweku Nduom, Paa Kwesi Nduom, Yvonne Nduom. (ng, )
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Birim Group, LLC by Kwasi Abraham Adjapon Asiedu (Asiedu, Kwasi)
December 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LR 3.2 Statement of Affiliates STATEMENT by Birim Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiff's Statement of Corporate Interest)(Asiedu, Kwasi)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By 2/12/2021, the parties are to file a joint status report. The parties may refer to the format detailed on the Court's website under New and Reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Birim Group, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17709853. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Asiedu, Kwasi)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birim Group, LLC v. Nduom et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Birim Group, LLC
Represented By: Kwasi Abraham Adjapon Asiedu
Represented By: Shelly Deidre Mcmillan
Represented By: Patricia Brown Holmes
Represented By: Ivan Settimba
Represented By: Lucas Thor Rael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Coast Fund Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paa Kwesi Nduom
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Paa Kwesi Nduom
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne Nduom
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Baffuor
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupe Nduom USA LLC
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edjah Nduom
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L Buckner
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa Kwesi Nduom
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Davidson
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InternationalBusiness Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nana Aba Nduom
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nana Kweku Nduom
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Finch
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GN Money LLC
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupe Nduom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Klamp
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C Goodall
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GN USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackshield Capital Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GN Bank
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?