Flaherty v. E.L.F. COSMETICS, INC.
Plaintiff: Norah Flaherty
Defendant: E.L.F. COSMETICS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07251
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 STATUS Report Initial Status Report by Norah Flaherty (Perry, Steven)
January 21, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by E.L.F. COSMETICS, INC.(Rothman, Ari)
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norah Flaherty as to E.L.F. COSMETICS, INC. on 12/11/2020, answer due 1/1/2021. (Perry, Steven)
December 30, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant's consent motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint #6 is granted. Defendant e.l.f. Cosmetics, Inc. shall have until 1/22/2021 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Mailed notice (dal, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by E.L.F. COSMETICS, INC. (Rothman, Ari)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant E.L.F. COSMETICS, INC. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 CONSENT MOTION, MOTION by Defendant E.L.F. COSMETICS, INC. for extension of time to file response/reply as to complaint #1 CONSENT MOTION (Rothman, Ari)
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status conference set for 2/9/2021 at 9:15 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, )
December 8, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant E.L.F. COSMETICS, INC. (lxk, )
December 8, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norah Flaherty by David B. Levin (Levin, David)
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norah Flaherty by Steven Gene Perry (Perry, Steven)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norah Flaherty by Todd M Friedman (Friedman, Todd)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Norah Flaherty; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17718493. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flaherty v. E.L.F. COSMETICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.L.F. COSMETICS, INC.
Represented By: Ari Nicholas Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norah Flaherty
Represented By: Steven Gene Perry
Represented By: David B. Levin
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?