Flaherty v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Plaintiff: Norah Flaherty
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07255
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the status hearing set for 2/8/21 is stricken.Mailed notice (ca, )
February 2, 2021 Filing 30 STATUS Report Initial Status Report by Norah Flaherty (Perry, Steven)
January 25, 2021 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: In light of the Court's 1/22/21 Minute Order #28 , the presentation date of 1/26/21 is stricken.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court grants the parties' agreed motion #27 to set a briefing schedule. Accordingly, Plaintiff's response brief in opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss #21 shall be due on or before 2/18/21, and Defendant's reply in support of its motion to dismiss shall be due on or before 3/11/21. Defendant's unopposed motion requesting judicial notice #24 is taken under advisement. No appearance is required on the motions #21 #24 #27 . Mailed notice (ca, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. to set a briefing schedule (Agreed Motion to Set Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike the Complaint (Dkt. 21)) (Chanoine, Hannah)
January 21, 2021 Filing 26 (Notice of Agreed Motion to Set Briefing Schedule) NOTICE of Motion by Hannah Chanoine for presentment of before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/26/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Chanoine, Hannah)
January 21, 2021 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. in Support of MOTION by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Unopposed, Requesting Judicial Notice in Support of its Opposed Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike the Complaint [ECF 21] #24 (Declaration of E. Clay Marquez in Support of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Unopposed Motion Requesting Judicial Notice in Support of Opposed Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike the Complaint with Exhibit A) (Chanoine, Hannah)
January 21, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Unopposed, Requesting Judicial Notice in Support of its Opposed Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike the Complaint [ECF 21] (Chanoine, Hannah)
January 21, 2021 Filing 23 (Notice of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Unopposed Motion Requesting Judicial Notice in Support of its Opposed Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike the Complaint) NOTICE of Motion by Hannah Chanoine for presentment of before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/26/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Chanoine, Hannah)
January 21, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, motion to strike, #21 (Memorandum of Law in Support of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Opposed Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike the Complaint) (Chanoine, Hannah)
January 21, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. , MOTION by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. to strike complaint #1 (Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Opposed Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike the Complaint) (Chanoine, Hannah)
January 21, 2021 Filing 20 (Notice of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Opposed Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike the Complaint) NOTICE of Motion by Hannah Chanoine for presentment of before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/26/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Chanoine, Hannah)
January 21, 2021 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Notification as to Affiliates; Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Chanoine, Hannah)
January 20, 2021 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. by Matthew M Morrissey (Morrissey, Matthew)
January 20, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. by Edmundo Clay Marquez (Marquez, Edmundo)
January 20, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. by Matthew Powers (Powers, Matthew)
January 20, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. by Hannah Chanoine (Chanoine, Hannah)
January 19, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motions to appear pro hac vice by Matthew Powers, Hannah Chanoine and Edmundo Marquez #11 #12 and [13 are granted. Mailed notice (ca, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17832503. (Marquez, Edmundo)
January 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17832441. (Chanoine, Hannah)
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17832399. (Powers, Matthew)
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for extension of time until January 21, 2021 to answer the complaint #8 is granted. The status hearing set for 1/27/21 is reset to 2/8/21 at 9:00 a.m., the joint status report is now due by 2/2/21.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Bradley Joseph Andreozzi for presentment of extension of time #8 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/30/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Andreozzi, Bradley)
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. for extension of time to Respond to Complaint and Adjourn Initial Status Hearing (UNOPPOSED) (Andreozzi, Bradley)
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. by Bradley Joseph Andreozzi (Andreozzi, Bradley)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norah Flaherty as to Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. on 12/11/2020, answer due 1/1/2021. (Levin, David)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 1/27/21 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 1/21/21. The report should comply with the requirements for initial joint status reports set forth in the Initial Status Conference standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==Mailed notice (ca, )
December 8, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (ke, )
December 8, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (as, )
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norah Flaherty by David B. Levin (Levin, David)
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norah Flaherty by Steven Gene Perry (Perry, Steven)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norah Flaherty by Todd M Friedman (Friedman, Todd)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Norah Flaherty; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17718939. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flaherty v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew M Morrissey
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Andreozzi
Represented By: Matthew Powers
Represented By: Hannah Chanoine
Represented By: Edmundo Clay Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norah Flaherty
Represented By: Steven Gene Perry
Represented By: David B. Levin
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?