Levinger v. Morell et al
Plaintiff: Leah Levinger
Defendant: WBEZ, Alex Keefe, Chicago Public Media, Inc., Claudia Morell and Maria Zamudio
Case Number: 1:2020cv07292
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendants' motion to dismiss #16 is taken under advisement; Plaintiff is given until 3/12/2021 to file a response; Defendants are given until 4/2/2021 to file a reply brief. The Court will issue a ruling by mail. Notice of motion date of 2/9/2021 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Discovery will be stayed pending the disposition of the motion to dismiss. Emailed notice (cdh, )
February 1, 2021 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Defendants (Bradford, Jason)
February 1, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Jason Michael Bradford for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #16 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 2/9/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Bradford, Jason)
February 1, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Alex Keefe, Claudia Morell, WBEZ, Maria Zamudio in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #16 (Bradford, Jason)
February 1, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Alex Keefe, Claudia Morell, WBEZ, Maria Zamudio (Bradford, Jason)
January 30, 2021 Filing 15 TRANSACTION Receipt, Successful by Plaintiff Leah Levinger. (jh, )
January 30, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Claudia Morell on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (jh, ) Modified on 2/1/2021 (jh, ).
January 30, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Alex Keefe on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (jh, ) Modified on 2/1/2021 (jh, ).
January 30, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Maria Zamudio on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (jh, ) Modified on 2/1/2021 (jh, ).
January 30, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to WBEZ aka Chicago Public Media, Inc. on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (jh, ) Modified on 2/1/2021 (jh, ).
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Alex Keefe, Claudia Morell, WBEZ, Maria Zamudio by William Lowell Von Hoene (Von Hoene, William)
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Alex Keefe, Claudia Morell, WBEZ, Maria Zamudio by Jason Michael Bradford (Bradford, Jason)
January 5, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Alex Keefe, Claudia Morell, WBEZ, Maria Zamudio (ke, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT filed by Leah Levinger. (Exhibits) (jh, )
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Leah Levinger. (jh, )
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jh, )
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint by Leah Levinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(jh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levinger v. Morell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WBEZ
Represented By: Jason Michael Bradford
Represented By: William Lowell Von Hoene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Keefe
Represented By: Jason Michael Bradford
Represented By: William Lowell Von Hoene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Public Media, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Michael Bradford
Represented By: William Lowell Von Hoene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Morell
Represented By: Jason Michael Bradford
Represented By: William Lowell Von Hoene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Zamudio
Represented By: Jason Michael Bradford
Represented By: William Lowell Von Hoene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Levinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?