Fitness Blueprint, LLC v. L.D.S., L.L.C.
Appellee: L.D.S., L.L.C.
Appellant: Fitness Blueprint, LLC d/b/a The Foundry Chicago. and Fitness Blueprint, LLC doing business as The Foundry Chicago
Case Number: 1:2020cv07331
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Gerard Cooke for presentment of motion to dismiss #5 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 2/11/2021 at 09:45 AM. (Cooke, Patrick)
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Appellant Fitness Blueprint, LLC to dismiss appeal per Rule 8023 (Cooke, Patrick)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Docket Sheet)(USBC-Ross, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Set briefing as follows: Appellant's initial brief due by 2/5/2021. Response brief due by 3/8/2021. Reply brief due by 3/22/2021. Ruling set for 4/29/2021 at 09:45 AM (to track the case only; no appearance will be required). Mailed notice (reg)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letter) (bg, )
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 20 B 17260 (Judge Hunt) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit)(USBC-Ross, )
December 11, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitness Blueprint, LLC v. L.D.S., L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: L.D.S., L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Fitness Blueprint, LLC d/b/a The Foundry Chicago.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Fitness Blueprint, LLC doing business as The Foundry Chicago
Represented By: Jacob Comrov
Represented By: Scott R. Clar
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?