Emirates v. Assaf et al
Plaintiff: Emirates
Defendant: Tala Logistics Incorporated, Tala Logistic Company, Tala Logistic Trucking, Anwar Assaf, Nawal Aldraidi, Mohd Assaf and Sabah Said
Case Number: 1:2020cv07655
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Referring Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 22 STATUS Report Initial Status Report by Emirates (McFetridge, Jane)
January 22, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendants' motion for extension #17 is granted. The answer or other responsive pleading is due on or before 2/24/21. Mailed notice (air, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by David C. Thollander for presentment of extension of time #17 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/26/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Thollander, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: This case has been reassigned to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. #7 . Therefore, the motion hearing noticed before Judge Bucklo is stricken. The motion is to be re-noticed before Judge Tharp consistent with his Standing Order. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by David C. Thollander for presentment of before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/22/2021 at 09:45 AM. (Thollander, David)
January 19, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendants Nawal Aldraidi, Anwar Assaf, Mohd Assaf, Sabah Said, Tala Logistic Company, Tala Logistic Trucking, Tala Logistics Incorporated for extension of time (Thollander, David)
January 19, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Nawal Aldraidi, Anwar Assaf, Mohd Assaf, Sabah Said, Tala Logistic Company, Tala Logistic Trucking, Tala Logistics Incorporated by David C. Thollander (Thollander, David)
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status reports, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==] and to submit an initial status report by 2/4/2021. The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Mailed notice (air, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Emirates regarding Affidavit of Proof of Service AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF SERVICE served on Anwar Assaf on 01/04/2021 (McFetridge, Jane)
January 8, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Emirates regarding Affidavit of Proof of Service AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF SERVICE served on Anwar Assaf on 01/04/2021 (McFetridge, Jane)
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Emirates regarding Affidavit of Proof of Service AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF SERVICE served on Mike Shoaibi on 01/07/2021 (McFetridge, Jane)
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Emirates regarding Affidavit of Proof of Service AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF SERVICE served on Sabah Said on 01/04/2021 (McFetridge, Jane)
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Emirates regarding Affidavit of Proof of Service AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF SERVICE served on Nawal Aldraidi on 01/04/2021 (McFetridge, Jane)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Emirates regarding Affidavit of Proof of Service AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF SERVICE served on Mohd Assaf on 01/04/2021 (McFetridge, Jane)
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Emirates regarding Affidavit of Proof of Service AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF SERVICE served on Anwar Assaf on 01/04/2021 (McFetridge, Jane)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr for all further proceedings. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/5/2021. (ph, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Minute entry dated 1/5/2021, document no. #5 is stricken as entered in error. Mailed notice (dal, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR (dal, ).
December 23, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Nawal Aldraidi, Anwar Assaf, Mohd Assaf, Sabah Said, Tala Logistic Company, Tala Logistic Trucking, Tala Logistics Incorporated (crl, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emirates by John Casey Leech APPEARANCE (Leech, John)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emirates by Jane M. McFetridge APPEARANCE (McFetridge, Jane)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McFetridge, Jane)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Emirates; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17770232. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6)(McFetridge, Jane)
December 22, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emirates v. Assaf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tala Logistics Incorporated
Represented By: David C. Thollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tala Logistic Company
Represented By: David C. Thollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tala Logistic Trucking
Represented By: David C. Thollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anwar Assaf
Represented By: David C. Thollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nawal Aldraidi
Represented By: David C. Thollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohd Assaf
Represented By: David C. Thollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabah Said
Represented By: David C. Thollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emirates
Represented By: John Casey Leech
Represented By: Jane M. McFetridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?