Ali v. Dalton et al
Plaintiff: Yaseen Ali
Defendant: Andrea Neumann, Steve Dalton and Candice Adams
Case Number: 1:2020cv07674
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 MAILED copy of docket and a copy of order dated 2/5/2021 to Plaintiff. (bg, )
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/5/2021: On or about 2/2/2021, Plaintiff filed a letter #8 accompanied by several hundred pages of exhibits. He indicates in his letter that he submitted these exhibits in one of his other cases (Case No. 20C7351), but the Court did not consider them in that case. Plaintiff's 2/2/2021 correspondence seems to have crossed in the mail with the Court's 1/28/2021 Order that dismissed this case with prejudice for failure to state a claim and as duplicative and malicious. #6 The Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff a copy of the docket, along with a copy of this Order. This case remains closed. Mailed notice (dal, )
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER from Yaseen Ali dated 1/25/21.(Exhibits,Envelope USPS Parcel Service) (nsf, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 ENTERED JUDGMENT Mailed notice (dal, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied as moot, as Plaintiff has paid the filing fee associated with this action 5 . However, Plaintiff's complaint #1 is nonetheless dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim and as duplicative and malicious. The dismissal counts as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Clerk is directed to enter final judgment in favor of Defendants. Plaintiff's pending motion for attorney representation #4 is denied as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (dal, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Yaseen Ali for attorney representation. (nsf, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Yaseen Ali for leave to proceed in forma pauperis.(Exhibits) (nsf, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (nsf, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Yaseen Ali. (Exhibits,) (Attachments: #1 Envelope post marked 12/15/20)(nsf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Dalton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Neumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaseen Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?