Wright v. City of Chicago
Plaintiff: Kim Woods, Mia Wright, Tnika Tate, CITY OF CHICAGO, Ebony Wilbourn, Javon Hill and Unknown Chicago Police Officers
Case Number: 1:2020cv07688
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Javon Hill, Kim Woods, Tnika Tate, Mia Wright, Ebony Wilbourn. City of Chicago waiver sent on 1/6/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (Uche, Nnanenyem)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Joi Kamper (Kamper, Joi)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Bret Anthony Kabacinski (Kabacinski, Bret)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to City of Chicago on 01/06/2021 by Plaintiffs Javon Hill, Tnika Tate, Ebony Wilbourn, Kim Woods, Mia Wright. Waiver of service due by 2/5/2021. (Uche, Nnanenyem)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Parties are directed to submit a joint written status report on or before March 1, 2021. Mailed notice (vcf, )
December 23, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Javon Hill, Tnika Tate, Ebony Wilbourn, Kim Woods, Mia Wright by Nnanenyem Eziudo Uche (Uche, Nnanenyem)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Uche, Nnanenyem)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Javon Hill, Kim Woods, Tnika Tate, Mia Wright, Ebony Wilbourn; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17773346.(Uche, Nnanenyem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Woods
Represented By: Nnanenyem Eziudo Uche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mia Wright
Represented By: Nnanenyem Eziudo Uche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tnika Tate
Represented By: Nnanenyem Eziudo Uche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF CHICAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Wilbourn
Represented By: Nnanenyem Eziudo Uche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javon Hill
Represented By: Nnanenyem Eziudo Uche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unknown Chicago Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?