Cruz v. City of Chicago
Plaintiff: Jerico Matias Cruz
Defendant: City of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2020cv07699
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: On December 30, 2020, this Court issued an order to show cause why the case should not be dismissed because the complaint appears to be duplicative of a complaint in a case filed before Judge Feinerman. See Cruz v. City of Chicago (20-cv-7415). The cases appear to involve the same parties and the same allegations about the same underlying incident. The Court set a deadline of January 11, 2021, but Plaintiff did not respond. The case is dismissed without prejudice because it is duplicative of an earlier-filed complaint in this District. The case is closed. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The Court reviewed the complaint, which appears to be duplicative of, if not identical to, a complaint in a pending case before Judge Feinerman. See Cruz v. City of Chicago (20-cv-7415). Plaintiff filed that case on December 14, and filed the case before this Court on December 22, 2020. In both cases, Plaintiff alleges that he was falsely arrested at the Jefferson Park library on August 5, 2020. He sued the same Defendants, too. By January 11, 2021, Plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed as duplicative of the earlier case filed before Judge Feinerman. If Plaintiff intended to amend his complaint in the first-filed case in some way, then the proper procedure was to file an amended complaint in that case, not file a brand-new lawsuit. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Jerico Matias Cruz for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (rp, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Jerico Matias Cruz (rp, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (rp, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint by Jerico Matias Cruz (Exhibits) (rp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerico Matias Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?