Reed v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Damarcus Reed
Defendant: Officer R. Rhodes #12625, CITY OF CHICAGO, OFFCER N. Mukite #15038, B. Collins, #16773, N. Mukite, B. Collins and R. Rhodes
Case Number: 1:2020cv07745
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City of Chicago, B. Collins, N. Mukite, R. Rhodes by Emily Rachel Bammel (Bammel, Emily)
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Unopposed motion for an extension of time to March 18, 2021 to answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted. Mailed notice(maf)
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, B. Collins, N. Mukite, R. Rhodes for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 or otherwise plead (unopposed) (Boose, Max)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City of Chicago, B. Collins, N. Mukite, R. Rhodes by Max C. Boose (Boose, Max)
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Damarcus Reed as to R. Rhodes on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. (Smith, Christopher)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Damarcus Reed as to N. Mukite on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. (Smith, Christopher)
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Damarcus Reed as to B. Collins on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. (Smith, Christopher)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Damarcus Reed as to City of Chicago on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (Smith, Christopher)
January 5, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants City of Chicago, B. Collins, N. Mukite, R. Rhodes (exr, )
December 28, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (crl, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Damarcus Reed by Christopher Rudolf Smith (Smith, Christopher)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Damarcus Reed; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17780405. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damarcus Reed
Represented By: Christopher Rudolf Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer R. Rhodes #12625
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Emily Rachel Bammel
Represented By: Max C. Boose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFCER N. Mukite #15038
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Collins, #16773
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Mukite
Represented By: Emily Rachel Bammel
Represented By: Max C. Boose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Collins
Represented By: Emily Rachel Bammel
Represented By: Max C. Boose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Rhodes
Represented By: Emily Rachel Bammel
Represented By: Max C. Boose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?