Smith v. City Of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Chet Smith
Defendant: Jay Westensee, C.O.P.A, Adam Pfeifer, Jessica Ciacco, Sydney Roberts, David Bar, James Oguilu, Samantha Bowler and City Of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2020cv07776
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER from Chet Smith dated 1/29/2021. (Envelope postmarked 2/3/2021). (mc, )
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: By order of Jan. 5, 2021, the Court directed Plaintiff to either submit a properly completed in forma pauperis application or pre-pay the $402.00 filing fee #6 . The Court later extended the deadline for compliance to Feb. 22, 2021 #9 . Plaintiff has submitted an incomplete in forma pauper is application that is neither certified nor accompanied by a copy of his trust fund statement for the six-month period preceding the filing of this lawsuit. That application #11 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff also submitted a letter #10 stating that he is having "major problems" getting jail officials to certify the IFP application. Attached to the letter is a grievance response indicating that due to the COVID-19 pandemic, all law library services are "request and delivery," meaning that inmates must fill out a request slip and the items will be delivered to them. It is unclear whether Plaintiff followed this procedure. Plaintiff also states that he wants to pre-pay the $402.00 filing fee but does not know how to do this. In the Court's experience, the Cook County Jail has established procedures by which an inmate can request that a filing fee be paid. Plaintiff should direct the trust fund account custodian to remit payment to the Court. Payment should be sent to the Clerk of Court, United States District Court, 219 South Dearborn Street, Chicago, Illinois 60604, attn: Cashier's Desk, 20th Floor, and must clearly identify Plaintiffs name and the case number assigned to this case. The Court extends the deadline for compliance with the Court's Jan. 5, 2021 order to 2/23/2021. Failure to comply will result in summary dismissal of this case. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 2/2/2021. Mailed notice (jn, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Chet Smith for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Envelope postmarked 1/19/2021). (mc, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER from Chet Smith dated 1/13/2021. (Envelope postmarked 1/19/2021). (mc, )
January 22, 2021 MAILED Plaintiff a blank in forma pauperis application and orders #6 and #9 . (mc, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER :Plaintiff has submitted a motion for status #8 asking whether his motion for attorney representation was granted. The filing of this motion indicates that Plaintiff did not receive the Court's Jan. 5, 2021 order denying his motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and for attorney representation without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for status is granted to the extent that the Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of that order #6 and a blank application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court extends the deadline for compliance with that order to 2-22. Failure to submit a properly completed in forma paueris application, or alternatively pay the $402.00 filing fee, by that date will result in summary dismissal of this matter. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 1/22/2021.Mailed notice(mc, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Chet Smith for Status (Envelope postmarked 1/12/2021). (mc, )
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Chet Smith. (Exhibits) (Envelope postmarked 01/11/2021) (rc, )
January 8, 2021 MAILED Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis (prisoner version) and a copy of order dated 1/5/2021 to plaintiff (rp, )
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is directed to either (1) submit a renewed application that is certified by a trust fund officer and that includes a copy of Plaintiff's prison trust fund statement showing activity in his account for the six months immediately preceding his filing of his complaint; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $402.00. Failure to comply with this order by 1/26, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis (prisoner version) and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 1/5/2021. Mailed notice (rp, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from Chet Smith dated 12/17/2020. (mc, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Chet Smith for attorney representation (Exhibit). (mc, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Chet Smith, Defendant Jay Westensee for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (mc, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (mc, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Chet Smith (Exhibit) (Attachments: #1 Envelope not postmarked)(mc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. City Of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Westensee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O.P.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Ciacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sydney Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Oguilu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Bowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chet Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?