Watson, as Next Friend and Mother of A.W. a Minor v. The City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Tiffiny Watson, as Next Friend and Mother of A.W. a Minor and Tiffiny Watson
Defendant: The City of Chicago, Lisa Buckhalter (#20073), William Doolin (#1837), Eric Curiel (#9650), Donna Albert (#20010), Tina Dudley (#21323), Christopher Walsh (#19439), Unknown Chicago Police Detective, Pierre Williams (#7632) and Jonathan Smith (#15292)
Case Number: 1:2020cv07783
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendant City of Chicago's motion to extend time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint #7 is granted to and including March 19, 2021. Deadline for parties' joint written status report and proposed discovery schedule of March 8, 2021 is stricken and re-set to March 31, 2021. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Tiffiny Watson to MOTION by Defendant The City of Chicago for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 or otherwise plead #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Johnson, Julian)
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant The City of Chicago for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 or otherwise plead (Lisy, Maxwell)
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The City of Chicago by Maxwell Evan Lisy (Lisy, Maxwell)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Parties are directed to submit a joint written status report and proposed discovery schedule on or before March 8, 2021. Mailed notice (vcf, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffiny Watson as to The City of Chicago on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021. (Johnson, Julian)
December 30, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The City of Chicago (mxo, )
December 30, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tiffiny Watson, as Next Friend and Mother of A.W. a Minor by Julian Michael Johnson (Johnson, Julian)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Johnson, Julian)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tiffiny Watson, as Next Friend and Mother of A.W. a Minor; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17785182.(Johnson, Julian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson, as Next Friend and Mother of A.W. a Minor v. The City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffiny Watson, as Next Friend and Mother of A.W. a Minor
Represented By: Julian Michael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffiny Watson
Represented By: Julian Michael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Chicago
Represented By: Maxwell Evan Lisy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Buckhalter (#20073)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Doolin (#1837)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Curiel (#9650)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Albert (#20010)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Dudley (#21323)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Walsh (#19439)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chicago Police Detective
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierre Williams (#7632)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Smith (#15292)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?