Zmyslowski v. Kohl's, Inc. p/k/a Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Regina Zmyslowski
Defendant: Kohl's Inc., Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. and Kohl's Inc. a Delaware Corporation, Individually and d/b/a KOHL'S INC., p/k/a KOHL'S INC., a Nevada Corporation, Individually and d/b/a KIN, INC OF ILLINOIS and KOHL'S other Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07810
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be served by 2/19/2021. Motions to amend the pleadings or add new parties shall be filed by 8/19/2021. Written discovery requests shall be served by 3/19/2021. Fact discovery shall be completed by 7/19/2021. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 10/19/2021. The initial status hearing set for 2/26/2021 #8 is stricken and re-set for 5/7/2021 at 9:00 a.m. By 4/30/2021, the parties shall file a joint status report addressing: (1) the discovery they have completed; (2) the discovery that remains to be taken; (3) any foreseeable obstacles to meeting the deadlines set forth in this order; (4) whether both sides would like a settlement conference with the Magistrate Judge; and (5) whether there is a need for the 5/7/2021 status hearing. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 11 STATUS Report Joint Written Status Report by Kohl's Inc.(a Delaware Corporation, Individually and d/b/a KOHL'S INC., p/k/a KOHL'S INC., a Nevada Corporation, Individually and d/b/a KIN, INC OF ILLINOIS and KOHL'S) (Malaty, Danielle)
February 3, 2021 Filing 10 Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Disclosures by Regina Zmyslowski (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Disclosures)(Beer, Andrea)
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service (Malaty, Danielle)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 2/26/2021 at 9:15 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 2/19/2021. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kohl's Inc.(a Delaware Corporation, Individually and d/b/a KOHL'S INC., p/k/a KOHL'S INC., a Nevada Corporation, Individually and d/b/a KIN, INC OF ILLINOIS and KOHL'S)(Malaty, Danielle)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The Clerk is directed to terminate Kohls, Inc. as a party defendant, and to change the caption to reflect the name of the other defendant to be: Kohl's, Inc. p/k/a Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 31, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Regina Zmyslowski by Andrea J. Beer (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing Attorney Appearance of Andrea J Beer)(Beer, Andrea)
December 30, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (as, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. by Danielle N Malaty (Malaty, Danielle)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Malaty, Danielle)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Regina Zmyslowski v. Kohl's, Inc., et al., case number (2020 L 12584) filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17788191. (Malaty, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zmyslowski v. Kohl's, Inc. p/k/a Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle N Malaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Inc. a Delaware Corporation, Individually and d/b/a KOHL'S INC., p/k/a KOHL'S INC., a Nevada Corporation, Individually and d/b/a KIN, INC OF ILLINOIS and KOHL'S other Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle N Malaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Zmyslowski
Represented By: Andrea J. Beer
Represented By: Steven Trakhtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?