Graham v. Prudential Protective Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jake W Graham
Defendant: Patrick Kakos, Matthew Keywell, Prudentail Defense Solutions, Inc, Prudential Security, Inc., Greg Wier, Prudential Protective Services, LLC and Patricia Guzik
Case Number: 1:2021cv00002
Filed: January 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17974469. (Leder, Brent) Modified on 3/1/2021 (aee, ).
February 12, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial Status hearing set for 2/25/2021 is reset for 3/17/2021 at 9:00 AM which will proceed via Teleconference. Joint Status Report shall be due by 3/10/2021. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jake W Graham. Matthew Keywell waiver sent on 1/2/2021, answer due 3/3/2021; Prudential Security, Inc. waiver sent on 1/2/2021, answer due 3/3/2021; Greg Wier waiver sent on 1/2/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. (Stauff, Lisa)
February 11, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jake W Graham. Patricia Guzik waiver sent on 1/2/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. (Stauff, Lisa)
February 11, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jake W Graham. Prudential Protective Services, LLC waiver sent on 1/2/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. (Stauff, Lisa)
February 11, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jake W Graham. Patrick Kakos waiver sent on 1/2/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. (Stauff, Lisa)
February 11, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jake W Graham. Prudentail Defense Solutions, Inc waiver sent on 1/2/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. (Stauff, Lisa)
January 20, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 2/25/2021 at 9:15 a.m. which will proceed via Teleconference. Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2021. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Teleconference instructions are as follows: Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900 to take you to Judge Kendall's telephone conference login. From there, join conference As Guest, ENTER YOUR NAME, Type the digits in the picture, Click on the Call Me option and fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, we ask that you keep your phone on mute until your case is called. Please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH AND EVERY TIME BEFORE YOU SPEAK. The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
January 4, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, )
January 2, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Prudential Defense Solutions Inc. on 1/2/2021 by Plaintiff Jake W Graham. Waiver of service due by 2/1/2021. (Stauff, Lisa)
January 2, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Matthew Keywell on 1/2/2021 by Plaintiff Jake W Graham. Waiver of service due by 2/1/2021. (Stauff, Lisa)
January 2, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Greg Wier on 1/2/2021 by Plaintiff Jake W Graham. Waiver of service due by 2/1/2021. (Stauff, Lisa)
January 2, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Patricia Guzik on 1/2/2021 by Plaintiff Jake W Graham. Waiver of service due by 2/1/2021. (Stauff, Lisa)
January 2, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Patrick Kakos on 1/2/2021 by Plaintiff Jake W Graham. Waiver of service due by 2/1/2021. (Stauff, Lisa)
January 2, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Prudential Protective Services, LLC on 01/2/2021 by Plaintiff Jake W Graham. Waiver of service due by 2/1/2021. (Stauff, Lisa)
January 2, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Prudential Security Inc on 1/2/2021 by Plaintiff Jake W Graham. Waiver of service due by 2/1/2021. (Stauff, Lisa)
January 1, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jake W Graham by John Anthony Krupa (Krupa, John)
January 1, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jake W Graham by Lisa M Stauff (Stauff, Lisa)
January 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Stauff, Lisa)
January 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jake W Graham; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17790373. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stauff, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Prudential Protective Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Kakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Keywell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudentail Defense Solutions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Security, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Wier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Protective Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Guzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake W Graham
Represented By: John Anthony Krupa
Represented By: Lisa M Stauff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?