Eikosidekas v. Chicago Union Station Company et al
Plaintiff: Anthoula Eikosidekas
Defendant: Chicago Union Station Company, Metra, The City of Chicago and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00071
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anthoula Eikosidekas by Richard R Gordon (Gordon, Richard)
February 10, 2021 Filing 22 QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 02/10/2021. Emailed notice (mw, )
February 10, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation's motion for protective order #20 is granted. Emailed notice (mw, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation for protective order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scolire, Christopher)
February 7, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the status report, R. 18, the following discovery schedule is set. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures due 02/25/2021. The first round of written discovery requests must be issued by 03/04/2021. Fact discovery, including any treating health care providers (if any), must be completed by 12/02/2021. Rule 26(a)(2)(C) summaries for treating health care providers (if any) must be disclosed 75 days in advance of the fact discovery deadline, and adjusts with any general extension of fact discovery deadline. Rule 16(b) deadline to add parties or amend pleadings is 09/07/2021. By 10/29/2021, the parties shall file a Deposition Scheduling Report listing the depositions already taken and (more importantly) the remaining deponents, all of whom must have ***confirmed*** deposition dates (not just proposed dates). Any person not on that Report will presumptively not be deposed without good cause (e.g., genuine surprise despite due diligence). If deponents are slow in confirming deposition dates, the parties should use the Report deadline to urge each other and non-parties to provide confirmed dates to avoid a motion to compel in advance of the deadline. The Court will set a retained-expert schedule later if needed. The parties shall promptly enter into any necessary HIPAA or other orders to obtain medical records, and pursue them diligently. After obtaining medical records, the parties should at least begin settlement negotiations. The Court will consider setting deadlines for a settlement exchange later. The tracking status hearing of 02/12/2021 is reset to 04/23/2021 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the parties shall file a joint discovery status report by 04/15/2021 (by which time the parties should have responded to written discovery requests and obtained medical records). Emailed notice (mw, )
February 4, 2021 Filing 18 STATUS Report JOINT INITIAL STATUS REPORT by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Laing, Susan)
January 29, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The City of Chicago(Jebson, Scott)
January 15, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The City's extension motion to answer or to respond #15 is granted to 02/04/2021. Initial tracking status hearing set for 02/12/2021 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will set the case schedule after reviewing the written status report. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 02/04/2021. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendant has not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If not all Defendants have been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (mw, )
January 14, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant The City of Chicago for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Jebson, Scott)
January 14, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Metra re answer to complaint #13 (Coleman, Minya)
January 14, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Metra(Coleman, Minya)
January 13, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The City of Chicago by Scott J. Jebson (Jebson, Scott)
January 13, 2021 Filing 11 NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by National Railroad Passenger Corporation(Scolire, Christopher)
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metra by Thomas Joseph Platt (Platt, Thomas)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metra by Russal John Anderson (Anderson, Russal)
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metra by Sue-Ann Rosen (Rosen, Sue-Ann)
January 8, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metra by Minya L. Coleman (Coleman, Minya)
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (bg, )
January 6, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service Proof of Filing Copy of Filed Notice of Removal in Circuit Court by Susan Kay Laing on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Laing, Susan)
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation by Christopher Thomas Scolire (Scolire, Christopher)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation by Susan Kay Laing (Laing, Susan)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Laing, Susan)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020 L 012487) filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17801090. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Laing, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eikosidekas v. Chicago Union Station Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Union Station Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metra
Represented By: Russal John Anderson
Represented By: Minya L. Coleman
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Platt
Represented By: Sue-Ann Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Chicago
Represented By: Scott J. Jebson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Scolire
Represented By: Susan Kay Laing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthoula Eikosidekas
Represented By: Robert Carl Thomas
Represented By: Richard R Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?