Isaacson v. DS Smith Plc
Plaintiff: Brett Isaacson
Defendant: DS Smith Plc
Case Number: 1:2021cv00125
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal #11 and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is dismissed without prejudice, each party will bear their own costs. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (axc).
January 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brett Isaacson without Prejudice (Malmstrom, Carl)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court has reviewed the Agreed Motion to Set Stipulated Response Deadline #9 . The Agreed Motion to Set Stipulated Response Deadline #9 is granted as follows: Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise plead is extended to 2/23/2021. Mailed notice (axc).
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant DS Smith Plc for extension of time (Agreed Motion to File Responsive Pleading) (Strom, William)
January 12, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 3/24/2021, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report.' The court will enter a scheduling order in response. The removing party must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the opposing party has not been served with notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(d), the removing party's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at analeah_charles@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the Joint Initial Status Report deadline. The removing party should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the opposing party has been given notice of removal. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report) (axc).
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (nsf, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brett Isaacson by Carl V. Malmstrom (Malmstrom, Carl)
January 8, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Palmersheim, Robert)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DS Smith Plc by William McHenry Strom (Strom, William)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DS Smith Plc by Anand C. Mathew (Mathew, Anand)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DS Smith Plc by Robert John Palmersheim (Palmersheim, Robert)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 12th Judicial Circuit Court, Will County, IL, case number (2020CH000765) filed by DS Smith Plc Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17810705. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-Order of Voluntary Dismissal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C-Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-Summons Returned, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E-Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F-Other State Court Filings)(Palmersheim, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaacson v. DS Smith Plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DS Smith Plc
Represented By: William McHenry Strom
Represented By: Anand C. Mathew
Represented By: Robert John Palmersheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Isaacson
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?