McPherson v. Clearview AI, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John McPherson
Defendant: Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That, Clearview AI, Inc. and Does 1 through 10
Intervenor: David Mutnick
Case Number: 1:2021cv00170
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 02 U.S.C. ยง 431
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 50 MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all Counsel of record. (nsf, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 49 RECEIVED from New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-03053,(nsf)
January 12, 2021 Filing 48 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of Illinois. (Signed by MDL Panel on 1/8/2021) (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
January 12, 2021 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of Illinois. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen McMahon: Telephone Conference held on 9/9/2020. Decision: Conference held. Proceedings in these six matters are stayed pending a disposition from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. There will be no conference September 16, 2020.Submitted by: Chloe Lewis (Court Reporter Pamela Utter). (mde) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned matter has been scheduled for a: Telephone Conference on Wednesday, September 9, 2020 at 10:30 A.M. before the Honorable Colleen McMahon, United States District Judge. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference Any scheduling difficulties must be brought to the attention of the Court in writing and faxed to Chambers at (212) 805-6326. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/18/2020) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION to Transfer Case / Motion of the Clearview Defendants for Transfer of Actions to the Southern District of New York Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Richard Schwartz, #4 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Hoan Ton-That, #5 Proof of Service, #6 ILN 1:20-512, #7 ILN 1:20-846, #8 ILN 1:20-2989, #9 ILN 1:20-3843, #10 NYS 1:20-1296, #11 NYS 1:20-2222, #12 NYS 1:20-3053, #13 NYS 1:20-3104, #14 NYS 1:20-3481, #15 NYS 1:20-3705).(Wolosky, Lee) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel Laurence Kurtzberg on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Kurtzberg, Joel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Floyd Abrams on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Abrams, Floyd) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Aaron M. Olsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/10/2020). (mde) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING THE MOTION TO INTERVENE AND TO DISMISS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO STAY CASES OR TRANSFER VENUE denying #12 Motion to Intervene. Mutnick's motion for leave to intervene permissively is, therefore, DENIED. This constitutes the decision and order of the Court. It is a written opinion. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove the motion at Dkt. No. 22 from the Court's list of pending motions. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/29/2020) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of David Mutnick's Notice of Supplemental Information in Support of Motion to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue re: #12 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1).(Drury, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 40 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #31 Supplemental Letter granting #29 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' time to respond to complaints in these actions is adjourned sine die. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/14/2020) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 39 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by John McPherson. Related Document Number: #38 ..(Olsen, Aaron) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Aaron M. Olsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19830050. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John McPherson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Aaron M. Olsen, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing).(Olsen, Aaron) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #38 MOTION for Aaron M. Olsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19830050. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. The order was filed separately. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Hoan Ton-That waiver sent on 4/29/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. Document filed by John McPherson..(Olsen, Aaron) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Richard Schwartz waiver sent on 4/29/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. Document filed by John McPherson..(Olsen, Aaron) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Clearview AI, Inc. waiver sent on 4/29/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. Document filed by John McPherson..(Olsen, Aaron) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 34 SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated May 12, 2020 re: David Mutnick's May 11, 2020 supplemental filing [Dkt. 33]. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Wolosky, Lee)[Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority and Factual Information re: #12 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Drury, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Scott Robert Drury to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/11/2020). (mde) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 31 SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated May 11, 2020 re: Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Wolosky, Lee) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated May 5, 2020 re: Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Wolosky, Lee) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 29 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated May 4, 2020. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Wolosky, Lee) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Scott R. Drury in Support re: #12 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5).(Drury, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by David Mutnick..(Drury, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 DAVID MUTNICK'S REQUEST TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM EXCEEDING 10 PAGES. ENDORSEMENT: OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/4/2020) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Scott Robert Drury to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19694777. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Scott R. Drury, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Affidavit).(Drury, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for Scott Robert Drury to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19694777. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Karen Newirth dated 05/01/2020. Document filed by David Mutnick..(Newirth, Karen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Joseph P. Guglielmo in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by John McPherson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Burke - Mem ISO Transfer Mot, #2 Exhibit 2 - Roberson - Mem ISO Transfer Mot, #3 Exhibit 3 - Roberson - Mulcaire Decl, #4 Exhibit 4 - Mutnick - Mem ISO Stay Mot, #5 Exhibit 5 - Mutnick - Mem ISO Transfer Mot, #6 Exhibit 6 - Mutnick - Schwartz Decl, #7 Exhibit 7 - Mutnick - Ton-That Decl, #8 Errata 8 - ND ILL - 3d Gen Am Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - BuzzFeed Article, #10 Exhibit 10 - Mutnick - Briefing Schedule).(Guglielmo, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Lee S. Wolosky in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Wolosky, Lee) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by John McPherson..(Guglielmo, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Wolosky, Lee) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Wolosky, Lee) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Joshua Lichtman on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Lichtman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Scott Wolosky on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Wolosky, Lee) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to respond to Mutnick's Motion to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue in their respective dockets by 5 PM on April 29, 2020. (Responses due by 4/29/2020.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/22/2020) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Anne Newirth on behalf of David Mutnick..(Newirth, Karen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Scott R. Drury in Support re: #12 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L).(Newirth, Karen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by David Mutnick..(Newirth, Karen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. Document filed by David Mutnick..(Newirth, Karen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 21, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-01296-CM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 21, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 21, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Guglielmo, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Schwartz..(pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hoan Ton-That..(pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Clearview AI, Inc...(pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erin Green Comite on behalf of John McPherson..(Comite, Erin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 16, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 16, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 16, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 20CV1296. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 16, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Joseph Peter Guglielmo. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carey Alexander on behalf of John McPherson..(Alexander, Carey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-01296. Document filed by John McPherson..(Guglielmo, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard Schwartz, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John McPherson..(Guglielmo, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hoan Ton-That, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John McPherson..(Guglielmo, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Clearview AI, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John McPherson..(Guglielmo, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clearview AI, Inc., Does 1 through 10, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19456553)Document filed by John McPherson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Guglielmo, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/12/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McPherson v. Clearview AI, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McPherson
Represented By: Carey Alexander
Represented By: Joseph Peter Guglielmo
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Aaron Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: David Mutnick
Represented By: Karen Anne Newirth
Represented By: Scott Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Schwartz
Represented By: Joel Laurence Kurtzberg
Represented By: Andrew Joshua Lichtman
Represented By: Floyd Abrams
Represented By: Lee Scott Wolosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoan Ton-That
Represented By: Joel Laurence Kurtzberg
Represented By: Andrew Joshua Lichtman
Represented By: Floyd Abrams
Represented By: Lee Scott Wolosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Laurence Kurtzberg
Represented By: Andrew Joshua Lichtman
Represented By: Floyd Abrams
Represented By: Lee Scott Wolosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?