Brash v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Brash
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank, N.A. and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2021cv00221
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Matthew Brash regarding Summons and Complaint served on United States of America c/o Attorney General on 2/10/21 (Burns, Jamie)
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint for Interpleader by BMO Harris Bank, N.A.(Sullivan, James)
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to answer #6 is granted. The deadline for Defendant IRS to file a responsive pleading is extended to 3/22/2021 The motion hearing set for 1/28/2021 #7 is stricken. Initial status hearing set for 4/6/2021 at 9:00 a.m. By 3/30/2021, the parties shall file a joint status report using the form on Judge Feinerman's web page on this District's website. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Mary A. Stallings for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #6 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/28/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Stallings, Mary)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant Internal Revenue Service for extension of time to file answer (Stallings, Mary)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Internal Revenue Service by Mary A. Stallings (Stallings, Mary)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BMO Harris Bank, N.A. by James Patrick Sullivan (Sullivan, James)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (bg, )
January 14, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2020 CH 07287) filed by Internal Revenue Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeCelles, David)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (DeCelles, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brash v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Brash
Represented By: Jamie Lynn Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
Represented By: James Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Mary A. Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?