Garces v. Gerber Products Co. et al
Plaintiff: Aileen Garces, Stacy Musto, Michelle Lyles, Christina Martinson, Shalaya Martin, Ashley Morgan, Jessica Reed, Michael Morrow, Julia Milton, Cori Lau, Chris Nalley, Laszlo Kovacs, Gladys Okolo, Carrie Ashbourne, Elizabeth Hall, Lidia Tilahun, Kira Spurgeon, Amber Hogan, Savanna Jarrell, Brandy Daniels, Jessica Conner, Jennifer Weiss, Lindsey Tarlton, Melissa Mejia, Cortney Powell, Soraya Santos, Ashlee Campion, Jenny Anderson, Chey'na Micciche, April Gillens, Julia Vice, Amy Prondzinski, Queen Pough, Edelin Altuve, Diego Galeana, Jandrea Glenn, Damen Walton and Janice Wilson
Defendant: The Hain Celestial Group, Inc., Gerber Products Co., Nurture, Inc. and Beech-Nut Nutrition Co.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00719
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' omnibus motion to sever and transfer #36 by 4/28/21, and Defendants shall file any reply by 5/12/21. Defendants' motion for leave to file excess pages #35 is granted. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 2, 2021 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM by Beech-Nut Nutrition Co. in support of motion to sever #36 and transfer Plaintiffs' Claims; Defendants' Joint Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Joint Omnibus Motion (Kiser, Livia)
April 2, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION by Defendant Beech-Nut Nutrition Co. to sever and transfer Plaintiffs' Claims; Defendants' Joint Omnibus Motion (Kiser, Livia)
April 2, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION by Defendant Beech-Nut Nutrition Co. for leave to file excess pages in Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Joint Omnibus Motion to Sever and Transfer Plaintiffs' Claims (Kiser, Livia)
April 1, 2021 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Hain Celestial Group, Inc. by Alexander Smith (Smith, Alexander)
March 30, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of appearance by Nurture, Inc. (jn, )
March 30, 2021 Filing 32 UNOPPOSED motion for extension of time by Beech-Nut Nutrition Co., Gerber Products Co., Nurture, Inc., The Hain Celestial Group, Inc. (jn, )
March 30, 2021 Filing 31 CORPORATE disclosure statement by Nurture, Inc. (jn, )
March 30, 2021 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's agreed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead to the amended complaint #29 is granted and any answer shall be filed on or before 5/10/2021. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION by Defendant Beech-Nut Nutrition Co. for extension of time to file answer (Trummel, Rachael)
March 24, 2021 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by Beech-Nut Nutrition Co. (Kiser, Livia)
March 24, 2021 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Beech-Nut Nutrition Co. by Livia McCammon Kiser (Kiser, Livia)
March 24, 2021 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Beech-Nut Nutrition Co. by Rachael M Trummel (Trummel, Rachael)
March 23, 2021 Filing 25 STATUS Report (Initial Joint) by Edelin Altuve, Jenny Anderson, Carrie Ashbourne, Ashlee Campion, Jessica Conner, Brandy Daniels, Diego Galeana, Aileen Garces, April Gillens, Jandrea Glenn, Elizabeth Hall, Amber Hogan, Savanna Jarrell, Laszlo Kovacs, Cori Lau, Michelle Lyles, Shalaya Martin, Christina Martinson, Melissa Mejia, Chey'na Micciche, Julia Milton, Ashley Morgan, Michael Morrow, Stacy Musto, Chris Nalley, Gladys Okolo, Queen Pough, Cortney Powell, Amy Prondzinski, Jessica Reed, Soraya Santos, Kira Spurgeon, Lindsey Tarlton, Lidia Tilahun, Julia Vice, Damen Walton, Jennifer Weiss, Janice Wilson (Zimmerman, Thomas)
March 22, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy Prondzinski, Lindsey Tarlton, Gladys Okolo, Amber Hogan, Janice Wilson, Cortney Powell, Aileen Garces, Julia Milton, Edelin Altuve, Christina Martinson, Melissa Mejia, Damen Walton, Soraya Santos, Michael Morrow, Ashlee Campion, Diego Galeana, Elizabeth Hall, Jandrea Glenn, Michelle Lyles, Lidia Tilahun, Jessica Conner, Brandy Daniels, Jennifer Weiss, Jenny Anderson, Chey'na Micciche, Jessica Reed, Julia Vice, Savanna Jarrell, Queen Pough, Shalaya Martin, Cori Lau, Stacy Musto, Laszlo Kovacs, April Gillens, Ashley Morgan, Chris Nalley, Carrie Ashbourne, Kira Spurgeon as to Beech-Nut Nutrition Co. on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
March 22, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy Prondzinski, Lindsey Tarlton, Gladys Okolo, Amber Hogan, Janice Wilson, Cortney Powell, Aileen Garces, Julia Milton, Edelin Altuve, Christina Martinson, Melissa Mejia, Damen Walton, Soraya Santos, Michael Morrow, Ashlee Campion, Diego Galeana, Elizabeth Hall, Jandrea Glenn, Michelle Lyles, Lidia Tilahun, Jessica Conner, Brandy Daniels, Jennifer Weiss, Jenny Anderson, Chey'na Micciche, Jessica Reed, Julia Vice, Savanna Jarrell, Queen Pough, Shalaya Martin, Cori Lau, Stacy Musto, Laszlo Kovacs, April Gillens, Ashley Morgan, Chris Nalley, Carrie Ashbourne, Kira Spurgeon (Zimmerman, Thomas)
March 22, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court grants Defendant Nurture, Inc.'s agreed motion to continue deadline for responsive pleading #20 . Defendant shall respond to the amended complaint #17 by 5/28/21. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 21 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Nurture, Inc. re attorney appearance #19 (Walker, Melanie)
March 19, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant Nurture, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 - Defendant Nurture, Inc.'s Agreed Motion To Continue Deadline To File Responsive Pleading - (Walker, Melanie)
March 19, 2021 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nurture, Inc. by Melanie Elizabeth Walker (Walker, Melanie)
March 16, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for transfer of actions to the Eastern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of Motion) (lma, )
March 5, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED complaint by Aileen Garces, Shalaya Martin, Kira Spurgeon, Laszlo Kovacs, Queen Pough, Stacy Musto, Carrie Ashbourne, Jessica Reed, April Gillens, Janice Wilson, Gladys Okolo, Christina Martinson, Ashlee Campion, Chris Nalley, Jennifer Weiss, Cortney Powell, Soraya Santos, Michael Morrow, Ashley Morgan, Edelin Altuve, Amy Prondzinski, Michelle Lyles, Julia Vice, Chey'na Micciche, Cori Lau, Melissa Mejia, Amber Hogan, Jessica Conner, Jenny Anderson, Elizabeth Hall, Damen Walton, Jandrea Glenn, Savanna Jarrell, Julia Milton, Lindsey Tarlton, Diego Galeana, Brandy Daniels, Lidia Tilahun against Gerber Products Co., The Hain Celestial Group, Inc., Nurture, Inc., Beech-Nut Nutrition Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Baby Food Staff Report)(Zimmerman, Thomas)
March 5, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Beech-Nut Nutrition Co., Nurture, Inc. (cp, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aileen Garces (Zimmerman, Thomas)
March 1, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's agreed motion to continue deadlines #14 is granted and any responsive pleading shall be filed on or before 4/16/2021. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 25, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Gerber Products Co. to continue Defendant Gerber Products Company's Agreed Motion to Continue Deadline to File Responsive Pleading (Devine, Matthew)
February 25, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aileen Garces as to Gerber Products Co. on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
February 25, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Gerber Products Co. by Matthew R Devine (Devine, Matthew)
February 24, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Kate Spelman's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. Defendant's agreed motion to continue deadline to file responsive pleading #10 is granted and any responsive pleading shall be filed on or before 4/16/2021. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant The Hain Celestial Group, Inc. to continue / Defendant The Hain Celestial Group, Inc.'s Agreed Motion to Continue Deadline to File Responsive Pleading (Panos, Dean)
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17956845. (Spelman, Kate)
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Hain Celestial Group, Inc. by Dean Nicholas Panos (Panos, Dean)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 3/22/2021, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aileen Garces by Matthew C. De Re (De Re, Matthew)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aileen Garces by Jeffrey Daniel Blake (Blake, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aileen Garces by Sharon Harris (Harris, Sharon)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aileen Garces by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr (Zimmerman, Thomas)
February 9, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
February 9, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Gerber Products Co., The Hain Celestial Group, Inc. (crl, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zimmerman, Thomas)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action filed by Aileen Garces; jury demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17909774.(Zimmerman, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garces v. Gerber Products Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aileen Garces
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon Harris
Represented By: Jeffrey Daniel Blake
Represented By: Matthew C. De Re
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Musto
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Lyles
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Martinson
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalaya Martin
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Morgan
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Reed
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Morrow
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Milton
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cori Lau
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Nalley
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laszlo Kovacs
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Okolo
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Ashbourne
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hall
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Tilahun
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kira Spurgeon
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Hogan
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savanna Jarrell
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Daniels
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Conner
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Weiss
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Tarlton
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Mejia
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cortney Powell
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soraya Santos
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashlee Campion
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Anderson
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chey'na Micciche
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Gillens
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Vice
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Prondzinski
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Queen Pough
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edelin Altuve
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego Galeana
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jandrea Glenn
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damen Walton
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Wilson
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hain Celestial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kate Spelman
Represented By: Dean Nicholas Panos
Represented By: Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerber Products Co.
Represented By: Matthew R Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurture, Inc.
Represented By: Melanie Elizabeth Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Co.
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Represented By: Rachael M Trummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?