Krajisnik v. C.D. Peacock, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Suzana Krajisnik
Defendant: Robert Baumgardner, Dyol Hill, Christopher Croteau, Seymour Holtzman, C.D. Peacock, Inc. and Yingxue Duan
Case Number: 1:2021cv00775
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM by C.D. Peacock, Inc. in Opposition to motion for reconsideration #28 DEFENDANT C.D. PEACOCK, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (McFetridge, Jane)
March 29, 2021 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Suzana Krajisnik by Richard Keith Hellerman (Hellerman, Richard)
March 23, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Yingxue Duan. (lxk, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court's 3/18/21 minute order is amended to state that Defendants' motion for an extension #31 is granted. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration #28 is due by 4/7/21. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due by 4/14/21. The Rule 16 initial status conference and hearing on Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is reset from 4/5/21 to 5/6/21 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
March 22, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Robert Baumgardner. (lxk, )
March 18, 2021 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendant C.D. Peacock, Inc., filed a motion #31 asking for 2 additional weeks to respond to Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration. Plaintiff's counsel says she tried to "compromise" by offering a two-day extension. #32 But, given that Plaintiff originally noticed its motion for reconsideration for presentation on 4/5/21, Plaintiff's counsel's stated belief that "it is in her best interest to preserve the possibility of a ruling on the Motion for Reconsideration prior to the hearing in the State court case" (which is 4/2/21) seems disingenuous, at best. The Court expects more from the attorneys who practice in the Northern District of Illinois. The Court recognizes that the parties have starkly different views of the facts and legal issues in this case. But the attorneys can zealously represent the interests of their respective clients, while simultaneously extending to one another some basic degree of professional courtesy. And, certainly, it is not an efficient use of this Court's resources to decide an disagreement about such a minor, nonsubstantive issue as a reasonable request for a 2 week extension. It is the hope of the Court that it will not have to resolve a dispute of this nature again. Plaintiff's motion #31 is granted. Mailed notice (np, )
March 17, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE by Suzana Krajisnik re response in opposition to motion, #32 (Fullett, Andrew)
March 17, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE by Suzana Krajisnikin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Suzana Krajisnik for reconsideration #28 , MOTION by Defendant C.D. Peacock, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for reconsideration #28 DEFENDANT C.D. PEACOCK, INC.'S MOTION FOR AN ENLARGMENT OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR #31 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fullett, Andrew)
March 17, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION by Defendant C.D. Peacock, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for reconsideration #28 DEFENDANT C.D. PEACOCK, INC.'S MOTION FOR AN ENLARGMENT OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (McFetridge, Jane)
March 15, 2021 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration #28 is due by 3/24/21. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due by 3/30/21. (ca, )
March 12, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Galper Fullett for presentment of motion for reconsideration #28 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/6/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Fullett, Andrew)
March 12, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff Suzana Krajisnik for reconsideration (Fullett, Andrew)
March 11, 2021 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Christopher Croteau, Dyol Hill, Seymour Holtzman by Audrey Olson Gardner (Gardner, Audrey)
March 11, 2021 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Christopher Croteau, Dyol Hill, Seymour Holtzman by Jane M. McFetridge (McFetridge, Jane)
March 9, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Suzana Krajisnik. Dyol Hill waiver sent on 3/2/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Fullett, Andrew)
March 9, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Suzana Krajisnik. C.D. Peacock, Inc. waiver sent on 3/2/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Fullett, Andrew)
March 9, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Suzana Krajisnik. Seymour Holtzman waiver sent on 3/2/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Fullett, Andrew)
March 9, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Suzana Krajisnik. Christopher Croteau waiver sent on 3/2/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Fullett, Andrew)
March 9, 2021 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Suzana Krajisnik by Andrew Galper Fullett (Fullett, Andrew)
March 1, 2021 Filing 20 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Suzana Krajisnik Exhibit R (refiled as redacted, formerly Exhibit S) regarding amended complaint,, #9 (Barack, Max)
March 1, 2021 Filing 19 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Suzana Krajisnik Exhibit K (refiled as redacted) regarding amended complaint,, #9 (Barack, Max)
February 22, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendant's unopposed motion #17 to seal exhibits K, ECF No. [9-7], and R, ECF No. [9-13], to Plaintiff's complaint is granted. Plaintiff is directed to file amended exhibits K and R with the confidential information redacted by 3/1/21. Mailed notice (ca, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant C.D. Peacock, Inc. to seal DEFENDANT C.D. PEACOCK'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBITS K AND R TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT (McFetridge, Jane)
February 17, 2021 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/12/21 before the Honorable John Z. Lee. Order Number: 40158. Court Reporter Contact Information: Joseph Rickhoff, 312-435-5562, joseph_rickhoff@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 3/10/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2021. (Rickhoff, Joseph)
February 16, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 4/5/21 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 3/30/21. The report should comply with the requirements for initial joint status reports set forth in the Initial Status Conference standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==Mailed notice (ca, )
February 15, 2021 Filing 14 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Suzana Krajisnik Exhibit O (sealed) regarding amended complaint,, #9 (Barack, Max)
February 15, 2021 Filing 13 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Suzana Krajisnik Exhibit J (sealed) regarding amended complaint,, #9 (Barack, Max)
February 15, 2021 Filing 12 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Suzana Krajisnik Exhibit C (sealed) regarding amended complaint,, #9 (Barack, Max)
February 15, 2021 Filing 11 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Suzana Krajisnik Exhibit B (sealed) regarding amended complaint,, #9 (Barack, Max)
February 15, 2021 Filing 10 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Suzana Krajisnik Exhibit A (sealed) regarding amended complaint,, #9 (Barack, Max)
February 15, 2021 Filing 9 Complaint at Law (filed as ordered redacted) AMENDED complaint by Suzana Krajisnik against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit Exhibit H, #6 Exhibit Exhibit I, #7 Exhibit Exhibit K, #8 Exhibit Exhibit L, #9 Exhibit Exhibit M (redacted), #10 Exhibit Exhibit N, #11 Exhibit Exhibit P, #12 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #13 Exhibit Exhibit R (formerly filed as Ex. S))(Barack, Max)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 2/12/21. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant's emergency motion to seal #6 is granted as to paragraphs 39, 40, 41, 42, 43, 44, 47, 48, 49, 50, 51, 52, 53, 54, 58, 61, 62, 63, 87, 93, 106, 121, 161, 178, 179, and Exhibits A, B, C, J, M (to the extent it contains the identifying email address), and O. The motion is denied in all other respects. Plaintiff should file another copy of the complaint and exhibits with these portions redacted by 2/15/21. Mailed notice (ca, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendant's emergency motion to seal the complaint is set for 2/12/21 at 1:00 p.m. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. Mailed notice (ca, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant C.D. Peacock, Inc. to seal document complaint,, #1 (EMERGENCY) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(McFetridge, Jane)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant C.D. Peacock, Inc. by Audrey Olson Gardner (Gardner, Audrey)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant C.D. Peacock, Inc. by Jane M. McFetridge (McFetridge, Jane)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Suzana Krajisnik by Haskell Sidney Garfinkel (Garfinkel, Haskell)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Suzana Krajisnik by Max Phillip Barack (Barack, Max)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 SEALED COMPLAINT filed by Suzana Krajisnik; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17919795. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R, #19 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Barack, Max) Modified on 2/12/2021 (sm, ).
February 11, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krajisnik v. C.D. Peacock, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Baumgardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyol Hill
Represented By: Audrey Olson Gardner
Represented By: Jane M. McFetridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Croteau
Represented By: Audrey Olson Gardner
Represented By: Jane M. McFetridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seymour Holtzman
Represented By: Audrey Olson Gardner
Represented By: Jane M. McFetridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.D. Peacock, Inc.
Represented By: Audrey Olson Gardner
Represented By: Jane M. McFetridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yingxue Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzana Krajisnik
Represented By: Max Phillip Barack
Represented By: Haskell Sidney Garfinkel
Represented By: Andrew Galper Fullett
Represented By: Richard Keith Hellerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?