Purcell et al v. Blust
Plaintiff: Kimberly Groome, Chris Purcell and United States of America
Defendant: Linda Blust
Case Number: 1:2021cv00787
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania as case 2:21-mc-00022, filed 03/03/2021.(nsf, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 17 TRANSFERRED to the The Eastern District of Pennsylvania the electronic record. (jh, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Based on the District Court's order #15 directing the Clerk of Court to transfer this case forthwith, the referral in this case is closed. Magistrate Judge Beth W. Jantz no longer referred to the case. (rbf, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The clerk is directed to transfer this case forthwith to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania based upon the parties' consent. Mailed notice (ca, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Linda Blust (Horton, Sara)
February 26, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Linda Blust by Sara Tonnies Horton (Horton, Sara)
February 23, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: This Court's Courtroom Deputy has received an email from counsel for subpoena respondent Layla Blust, advising of her consent to transfer Plaintiff's motion to compel #3 to the E.D. Pennsylvania, and cc'ing Plaintiff's counsel. Counsel for Ms. Blust is directed to file an appearance and statement of consent to transfer on the docket by 03/02/2021. The briefing schedule previously set by this Court on 02/22/2021 #10 is stricken. (rbf, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Bruce Parke (Exhibits Corrected) regarding motion to compel #3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Shamberg, Kyle)
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Plaintiffs' motion to compel was referred to the Magistrate Judge on 02/18/2021. [Dkt. 9.] The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' motion and supporting materials, and notes that the exhibits referenced in Plaintiffs' supporting declaration were not all included in Plaintiffs' filing. [See dkt 4.] Accordingly, Plaintiffs are given until 03/01/2021 to supplement their prior submission with a complete, correctly labeled set of exhibits, and to provide a status update, if any, on any continued efforts to meet and confer on the issues raised in the motion. Subpoena respondent Layla Blust is given until 03/15/2021 to respond to the motion to compel. (rbf, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Beth W. Jantz for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: motion to compel #3 .(ca, )Mailed notice.
February 18, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's motion to compel compliance with a third-party subpoena #3 is referred to Magistrate Judge Jantz.Mailed notice (ca, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John Z. Lee for all further proceedings. Honorable Charles P. Kocoras no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 02/17/2021. (daj, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE Amended Certificate of Service of Motion to Compel (Shamberg, Kyle)
February 12, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rc, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Shamberg, Kyle)
February 12, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Bruce Parke regarding motion to compel #3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Shamberg, Kyle)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiffs Kimberly Groome, Chris Purcell, United States of America to compel compliance with third-party subpoena (Shamberg, Kyle)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kimberly Groome, Chris Purcell, United States of America by Kyle Alan Shamberg (Shamberg, Kyle)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Kimberly Groome, Chris Purcell, United States of America Civil Cover Sheet for Miscellaneous Case (Action to Enforce Subpoena) Filing fee $ 49, receipt number 0752-17921424. (Shamberg, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purcell et al v. Blust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Groome
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Purcell
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Blust
Represented By: Sara Tonnies Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?