Gray et al v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Plaintiff: Erika Brown, Kenneth Brewer, Lisa Satchel and Phyllis Gray
Defendant: LNK International, Inc. and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00856
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Filing 41 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by LNK International, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'meara, Peter)
March 2, 2021 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Defendants' motion to reassign #36 is denied without prejudice because pursuant to Local Rule 40.4(c) it is properly filed on the docket of case no. 18-cv-07585. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 1, 2021 Filing 39 REPLY by Defendants LNK International, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, #37 and in support of Motion to Reassign (O'meara, Peter)
February 23, 2021 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Defendants may file a reply in support of their motion to reassign case #36 by 3/1/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 37 RESPONSE by Kenneth Brewer, Erika Brown, Phyllis Gray, Lisa Satchelin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants LNK International, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. to reassign case under Local Rule 40.3(b)(2) #36 Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Reassign (Breit, Mitchell)
February 22, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION by Defendants LNK International, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. to reassign case under Local Rule 40.3(b)(2) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(O'meara, Peter)
February 22, 2021 Filing 35 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by LNK International, Inc. and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure (O'meara, Peter)
February 22, 2021 Filing 34 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure (O'meara, Peter)
February 19, 2021 Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kenneth Brewer, Erika Brown, Phyllis Gray, Lisa Satchel by Jason O Barnes (Barnes, Jason)
February 19, 2021 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kenneth Brewer, Erika Brown, Phyllis Gray, Lisa Satchel by Eric S. Johnson (Johnson, Eric)
February 19, 2021 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kenneth Brewer, Erika Brown, Phyllis Gray, Lisa Satchel by Thien An V Truong (Truong, Thien An)
February 19, 2021 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kenneth Brewer, Erika Brown, Phyllis Gray, Lisa Satchel by Mitchell M Breit (Breit, Mitchell)
February 19, 2021 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants LNK International, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. by Jay N Varon (Varon, Jay)
February 18, 2021 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants LNK International, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. by Peter James O'meara (O'meara, Peter)
February 16, 2021 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By 3/2/2021, the parties are to file a joint status report. The parties may refer to the format detailed on the Court's website under New and Reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 26 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record (bg, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 25 RECEIVED from New York Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-04415 (bg)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: For the reasons set forth (PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS), Defendants' motion to transfer venue to the Northern District of Illinois is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 2/11/2021. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court will first consider the Motion to Transfer. The deadline for the filing of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Answer to the Amended Complaint is continued to the date 21 days after the Court's ruling on Defendants' Motion to Transfer. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 12/18/2020. (Simmons, James) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #22 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint by Kenneth Brewer, Erika Brown, Phyllis Gray, Lisa Satchel. (Breit, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 22 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint by LNK International, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Madavo, Sara) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 21 Letter Second Supplemental Letter re DE #7 Motion to Transfer by LNK International, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Madavo, Sara) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 20 Letter Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Walgreens' Letter Motion [Doc. No. 7] by Kenneth Brewer, Erika Brown, Phyllis Gray, Lisa Satchel (Breit, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Filing 19 Letter Supplemental Letter re DE #7 Motion to Transfer by LNK International, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Madavo, Sara) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay N. Varon on behalf of LNK International, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Varon, Jay) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David A Hickerson on behalf of LNK International, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Hickerson, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 11/30/2020. (Reilly, Megan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 11/23/2020. (Reilly, Megan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #7 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court waives its pre-motion conference requirement and will construe Defendant's letter, (ECF No. 7), as a motion to transfer and motion to dismiss, and Plaintiffs' response, (ECF No. 11), as an opposition to the motion. Should the parties wish to supplement their positions, they may do so in writing so long as they file within fourteen days of this Order. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/19/2020. (Simmons, James) Modified on 11/19/2020 (Ortiz, Grisel). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 16 Letter Amending DE 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 D.C. Certificate of Good Standing) (Varon, Jay) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER deferring ruling on DE #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court notes that the pending motion for leave to appear pro hac vice is deficient in that it fails to comply with Local Rule 1.3(C). Specifically, the application fails to include a certificate of good standing issued 30 days before filing from the DC bar. Accordingly, the attorney is granted leave to amend his motion on or before 11/30/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 11/17/2020. (Reilly, Megan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 11/17/2020. (Reilly, Megan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
November 12, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam A. Edwards Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13673083. by Kenneth Brewer, Erika Brown, Phyllis Gray, Lisa Satchel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Edwards, Adam) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including 12/29/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 11/6/2020. (Reilly, Megan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Madavo, Sara) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to LNK International, Inc.. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. Re #10 Amended Complaint by Kenneth Brewer, Erika Brown, Phyllis Gray, Lisa Satchel (Breit, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No name and address on the Plaintiffs attorney name and addresses section., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Request for Pre-Motion Conference filed by All Plaintiffs. (Breit, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., LNK International, Inc., filed by Phyllis Gray, Kenneth Brewer, Lisa Satchel, Erika Brown. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Breit, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13597417. by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificates of Good Standing) (Varon, Jay) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13597000. by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificates of Good Standing) (Hickerson, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Madavo, Sara) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Madavo, Sara) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Phyllis Gray, Kenneth Brewer, Lisa Satchel, Erika Brown. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Breit, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13392189 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Phyllis Gray, Kenneth Brewer, Lisa Satchel, Erika Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Breit, Mitchell) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/21/2020) (Bowens, Priscilla). Modified on 9/22/2020 (Rodin, Deanna). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/16/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray et al v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Brown
Represented By: Adam Arthur Edwards
Represented By: Mitchell M Breit
Represented By: Jason O Barnes
Represented By: Thien An V Truong
Represented By: Eric S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Brewer
Represented By: Adam Arthur Edwards
Represented By: Mitchell M Breit
Represented By: Jason O Barnes
Represented By: Thien An V Truong
Represented By: Eric S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Satchel
Represented By: Adam Arthur Edwards
Represented By: Mitchell M Breit
Represented By: Jason O Barnes
Represented By: Thien An V Truong
Represented By: Eric S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Gray
Represented By: Adam Arthur Edwards
Represented By: Mitchell M Breit
Represented By: Jason O Barnes
Represented By: Thien An V Truong
Represented By: Eric S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LNK International, Inc.
Represented By: David Alexander Hickerson
Represented By: Jay N Varon
Represented By: Sara Madavo
Represented By: Peter James O'meara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Madavo
Represented By: Jay N Varon
Represented By: David Alexander Hickerson
Represented By: Peter James O'meara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?