Ingredion Incorporated v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Plaintiff: Ingredion Incorporated
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company, BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation Inc and Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01195
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the District of Columbia as case 1:21-cv-00913, filed 04/02/2021. (aee, )
April 2, 2021 Filing 22 TRANSFERRED to the USDC District of Columbia the electronic record (mc, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 21 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to USDC District of Columbia. Mailed notice(mc, )
April 1, 2021 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL. 2925 Conditional Transfer Order filed 4/1/2021 (mc, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company by Maureen Ann McGuire (McGuire, Maureen)
March 29, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Pursuant to the stipulation #18 and good cause shown, Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended until two days after this case is docketed in the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Mailed notice. (dm, )
March 29, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION Request to Extend Time for Defendant's to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Heery, Christopher)
March 29, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company by Christopher C. Heery (Heery, Christopher)
March 17, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ingredion Incorporated as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Asaro, Lenny)
March 17, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ingredion Incorporated as to CSX Transportation Inc on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Asaro, Lenny)
March 17, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ingredion Incorporated as to BNSF Railway Company on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Asaro, Lenny)
March 17, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ingredion Incorporated as to Union Pacific Railroad Company on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Asaro, Lenny)
March 12, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Motions to appear pro hac vice by William L. Roberts, Jonathan W. Dettmann, and Craig S. Coleman #9 #10 #11 are granted. Counsel is reminded to become familiar with this court's local rules (including the rules requiring local counsel and describing this court's trial bar). Mailed notice. (dm, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18012459. (Coleman, Craig)
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18011813. (Dettmann, Jonathan)
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18011193. (Roberts, William)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 5/13/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Motion to appear pro hac vice by George T. Caplan and Kristopher S. Davis #5 #6 is granted. Counsel is reminded to become familiar with this court's local rules (including the rules requiring local counsel and describing this court's trial bar). Mailed notice. (dm, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17998347. (Davis, Kristopher)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17998297. (Caplan, George)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Ingredion Incorporated (Rule 7.1(A) Corporate Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3.2 Notification as to Affiliates) (Asaro, Lenny)
March 3, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation Inc, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company (cp, )
March 3, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cl, )
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ingredion Incorporated by Lenny Dion Asaro (Asaro, Lenny)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Asaro, Lenny)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ingredion Incorporated; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17982421.(Asaro, Lenny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingredion Incorporated v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingredion Incorporated
Represented By: Lenny Dion Asaro
Represented By: Jonathan William Dettmann
Represented By: Craig Stuart Coleman
Represented By: William Lewis Roberts
Represented By: Kristopher S. Davis
Represented By: George T. Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Maureen Ann McGuire
Represented By: Christopher C. Heery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?