Ace American Insurance Company v. The Boeing Company et al
Plaintiff: Ace American Insurance Company
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc., THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation, Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. and The Boeing Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01238
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Daniel Thomas Burley (Burley, Daniel)
June 22, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company to stay (Joint) (Ledford, Christopher)
June 22, 2021 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Christopher Martin Ledford (Ledford, Christopher)
June 1, 2021 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendants' Motions for extension of time to Answer or otherwise plead #24 and #25 are granted. Answer shall be filed by 6/29/2021. Motion hearing set for 6/2/2021 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 27 (AGREED) NOTICE of Motion by Lisa Bradley for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #25 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/2/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Bradley, Lisa)
May 26, 2021 Filing 26 (AGREED) NOTICE of Motion by Lisa Bradley for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #24 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/2/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Bradley, Lisa)
May 26, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION by Defendant Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (AGREED) (Bradley, Lisa)
May 26, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (AGREED) (Bradley, Lisa)
May 26, 2021 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. by Lisa Bradley (Bradley, Lisa)
May 26, 2021 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. by Lisa Bradley (Bradley, Lisa)
May 26, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendants' Agreed Motion for extension of time to Answer #19 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 6/29/2021. Teleconference Initial Status hearing reset for 7/13/2021 at 9:15 AM. Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2021. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Motion hearing set for 6/1/2021 is stricken.Mailed notice (lk, )
May 25, 2021 Filing 20 Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan R Buck for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #19 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/1/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Buck, Jonathan)
May 25, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond (Agreed) (Buck, Jonathan)
April 2, 2021 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ace American Insurance Company by Travis Richard Wall (Wall, Travis)
March 31, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendants Rockwell Collins, Inc. and Rosemont Aerospace, Inc.'s (collectively "Defendants") Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #15 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 5/31/2021. Motion hearing set for 4/1/2021 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
March 29, 2021 Filing 16 AGREED NOTICE of Motion by Shane Brian Nichols for presentment of extension of time #15 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/1/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Nichols, Shane)
March 29, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendants Rockwell Collins, Inc., Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. for extension of time (AGREED) (Nichols, Shane)
March 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. (Nichols, Shane)
March 29, 2021 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Nichols, Shane)
March 29, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. by Shane Brian Nichols (Nichols, Shane)
March 29, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. by Shane Brian Nichols (Nichols, Shane)
March 29, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Agreed Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 5/31/2021. Teleconference Status hearing set for 6/7/2021 at 9:00 AM. Motion hearing set for 3/31/2021 is stricken. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
March 26, 2021 Filing 9 Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan R Buck for presentment of extension of time #8 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/31/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Buck, Jonathan)
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for extension of time (Agreed) (Buck, Jonathan)
March 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Boeing Company (Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Buck, Jonathan)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Jonathan R Buck (Buck, Jonathan)
March 8, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Rockwell Collins, Inc., Rosemount Aerospace, Inc., The Boeing Company (gw, )
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Related Cases by Ace American Insurance Company (Zeeck, Brian)
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ace American Insurance Company by Conrad C Nowak (Nowak, Conrad)
March 5, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ace American Insurance Company by Brian Richard Zeeck (Zeeck, Brian)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zeeck, Brian)
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Equitable Indemnity filed by Ace American Insurance Company; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17991125. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Zeeck, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ace American Insurance Company v. The Boeing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc.
Represented By: Shane Brian Nichols
Represented By: Lisa Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemount Aerospace, Inc.
Represented By: Shane Brian Nichols
Represented By: Lisa Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Jonathan R Buck
Represented By: Christopher Martin Ledford
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Burley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian Richard Zeeck
Represented By: Travis Richard Wall
Represented By: Conrad C Nowak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?